This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 07:29:57 (UTC).

Johnson v. The Car Store et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Johnson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against The Car Store. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca Grady Jennings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00339

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca Grady Jennings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brandi Johnson

Defendants

The Car Store

Equifax Information Services, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David W. Hemminger

Attorney at Hemminger Law Office, PSC

331 Townepark Circle, Suite 100-C

Louisville, KY 40243

Defendant Attorney

M. Thurman Senn

Attorney at Morgan & Pottinger, PSC - Louisville

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 1200

Louisville, KY 40202

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (KD) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC; The Car Store; and Trans Union, LLC filed by Brandi Johnson. (KD) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/27/2019 - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Verified Complaint (DN #7 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint shall be deemed filed as of the date of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (KD) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

7 #3

Summons Trans Union

7 #2

Exhibit Amended Complaint

7 #1

Proposed Order To Amend

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct Verified Complaint by Plaintiff Brandi Johnson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Amend, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Trans Union) (Hemminger, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Car Store. (Senn, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Car Store. (Senn, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by M. Thurman Senn on behalf of The Car Store (Senn, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, The Car Store. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (AME) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (AME) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, The Car Store (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2859280.), filed by Brandi Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (KD) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC; The Car Store; and Trans Union, LLC filed by Brandi Johnson. (KD) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/27/2019 - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Verified Complaint (DN #7 ) is hereby GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Verified Complaint shall be deemed filed as of the date of entry of this Order. cc: Counsel (KD) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct Verified Complaint by Plaintiff Brandi Johnson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order To Amend, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Summons Trans Union) (Hemminger, David) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Car Store. (Senn, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Car Store. (Senn, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by M. Thurman Senn on behalf of The Car Store (Senn, M.) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, The Car Store. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (AME) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (AME) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, The Car Store (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2859280.), filed by Brandi Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (AME) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.