This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/05/2021 at 08:07:30 (UTC).

Johnson v. State of Oregon et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Oregon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is John V. Acosta. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00702

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John V. Acosta

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mathew Johnson

Defendants

John-Michael Theisen

State of Oregon

John Doe #1

Holly Schauer

State of Arizona

David Douglas School District

Kathy Wentz

Oregon Department of Human Services

John Doe #3

John Doe #2

Arizona Department of Child Safety

Jessica Carranza

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennie L. Clark

Attorney at Clark Law and Associates, LLC

6501 Sw Macadam Ave. Suite E

Portland, OR 97239

Barry Fifth-Lince

Attorney at Clark Law & Associates, LLC

6501 Sw Macadam Ave

Portland, OR 97239

Defendant Attorneys

Dirk L. Pierson

Attorney at Department of Justice

1162 Court Street Ne

Salem, OR 97301-4096

Lucas W. Reese

Attorney at Garrett Hemann Robertson P.C.

1011 Commercial Street Ne

Salem, OR 97308-0749

Iain Armstrong

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Ste 900

Portland, OR 97204

Benjamin F. Veralrud

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

888 Sw Fifth Avenue, Suite 900

Portland, OR 97204-2025

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

19 #5

J Carranza

19 #4

Arizona

19 #3

ArizonaDCS

19 #2

H. Schuaer

19 #1

David Douglas S.D.

#19

#9

6 #8

Proposed Summons ODHS

6 #3

Proposed Summons David Douglas

6 #2

Proposed Summons AZ

6 #1

Proposed Summons ACDS

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATED LIMITED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS STATE OF ARIZONA, ARIZONA DEPT. OF CHILD SAFETY, AND JESSICA CARRANZA ONLY. Signed on 6/28/2021 by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (pjg) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Stipulated Proposed Form of Order Submitted Limited Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice. Filed by Arizona Department of Child Safety, Jessica Carranza, State of Arizona. (Veralrud, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants (Attachments: #1 David Douglas S.D., #2 H. Schuaer, #3 ArizonaDCS, #4 Arizona, #5 J Carranza) Filed by Mathew Johnson. (Clark, Jennie) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8072143. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Barry Fifth-Lince. Regarding document #9 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (lp) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Kathy Wentz waiver sent on 6/10/2021. Filed by Kathy Wentz. (Pierson, Dirk) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by State of Oregon waiver sent on 6/10/2021. Filed by State of Oregon. (Pierson, Dirk) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Oregon Department of Human Services waiver sent on 6/10/2021. Filed by Oregon Department of Human Services. (Pierson, Dirk) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #13 . Deadline for defendants David Douglas School District and Holly Schauer to respond to the amended complaint is extended to 7/12/2021. (pjg) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Holly Schauer, David Douglas School District. (Reese, Lucas) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge Acosta: GRANTING Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #10 . Deadline for defendants State of Arizona, Arizona Dept. of Child Safety, and Jessica Carranza to respond to the Amended Complaint is extended to 7/12/2021. (pjg) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint #2 . Filed by Arizona Department of Child Safety, State of Arizona, Jessica Carranza. (Veralrud, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First Request for Refund of Electronic Payment. Filed by Mathew Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment) (Clark, Jennie) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docket(#8) A duplicate payment in the amount of $402.00 was submitted by Mathew Johnson in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit #Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees on the Court website. Refund Request is Due 5/27/2021. (nd) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued Electronically as to Arizona Department of Child Safety, Jessica Carranza, David Douglas School District, Oregon Department of Human Services, Holly Schauer, State of Arizona, State of Oregon, John-Michael Theisen, Kathy Wentz. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons ACDS, #2 Proposed Summons AZ, #3 Proposed Summons David Douglas, #4 Proposed Summons Holly Schauer, #5 Proposed Summons J Carranza, #6 Proposed Summons JM Theisen, #7 Proposed Summons Kathy Wentz, #8 Proposed Summons ODHS) Filed by Mathew Johnson. (Clark, Jennie) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons Filed by Mathew Johnson. (Clark, Jennie) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/7/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/4/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 10/4/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) First Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 , Amended Complaint #2 . Filed by Mathew Johnson. (Clark, Jennie) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) First Amended Complaint . Filed by Mathew Johnson against All Defendants. (Clark, Jennie) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) First Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8072236 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Mathew Johnson against All Defendants. (Clark, Jennie) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Oregon Department of Human Services (DHS) is a litigant

Latest cases where Arizona Department of Child Safety is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennie L. Clark