This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:38:04 (UTC).

Johnson v. SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Johnson filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-62937

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Johnson

Defendants

Does 1 through 10 inclusive

SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC

1325 Ne 14Th Ave

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa Ann Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Dr., Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER, striking #9 Answer to Complaint filed by SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC, SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC response due 1/22/2020. The Defendants failure to appear through counsel to defend this suit by January 22 will result in an entry ofdefault. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#9

(#9) STRICKEN-ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC. Text Modified on 1/9/2020 (mee).Per Order d.e. #10 (Entered: 12/30/2019)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Mark Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Higbee, Melissa) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Mark Johnson. SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Higbee, Melissa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS OR DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

4 #1

Complaint

#4

(#4) FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC. (mee) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

1 #5

Summons for Speardiver International Inc.

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10 inclusive, SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12184991, filed by Mark Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons for Speardiver International Inc.)(Higbee, Melissa) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, striking #9 Answer to Complaint filed by SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC, SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC response due 1/22/2020. The Defendants failure to appear through counsel to defend this suit by January 22 will result in an entry ofdefault. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STRICKEN-ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC. Text Modified on 1/9/2020 (mee).Per Order d.e. #10 (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #7 the Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/29/2019. (jrf) (Entered: 12/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Mark Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Higbee, Melissa) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Mark Johnson. SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC served on 12/10/2019, answer due 12/31/2019. (Higbee, Melissa) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE PLAINTIFFS OR DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FORM AO 121 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. COPYRIGHT OFFICE (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mee) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC. (mee) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1 through 10 inclusive, SPEARDIVER INTERNATIONAL INC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12184991, filed by Mark Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons for Speardiver International Inc.)(Higbee, Melissa) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less