This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 10:41:36 (UTC).

Johnson v. Scott, et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Scott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Phil Gilbert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00348

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Phil Gilbert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyler Neal Johnson

Mt Vernon, IL 62864

Defendants

Captain Scott

Jefferson County Sheriff's Office

Mack

McKinnon

Scott

Nancy

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Tyler Neal Johnson. (jsm2) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#13

(#13) ORDER DISMISSING #12 First Amended Complaint without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a "Second Amended Complaint" on or before July 18, 2019. Should Plaintiff fail to file a Second Amended Complaint within the allotted time or consistent with the instructions set forth in this Order, the entire case shall be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with a court order and/or for failure to prosecute his claims. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The dismissal shall also count as one of Plaintiff's three allotted "strikes" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/20/2019. (jsy) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

#12

(#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mack, McKinnon, Nancy, Scott filed by Tyler Neal Johnson.(jsm2) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

#11

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#10

(#10) ORDER DISMISSING #1 Complaint (including COUNTS 1 and 2) without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a "First Amended Complaint" on or before April 29, 2019. Should Plaintiff fail to file a First Amended Complaint within the allotted time or consistent with the instructions set forth in this Order, the entire case shall be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with a court order and/or for failure to prosecute his claims. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The dismissal shall also count as one of Plaintiffs three allotted "strikes" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/1/2019. (jsy) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE AND ORDER: This Court has received your Complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee from the Southern District of Indiana, previously assigned case number: 19-cv-38-RLY-DML. Your new case number is 19-cv-348-JPG. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. The Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/26/2019. (jsm2) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00038. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Southern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Southern District of Illinois, on March 26, 2019. (LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#6

(#6) CLOSED TRANSFER to Southern District of Illinois at Benton. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/26/2019 (copy mailed to plaintiff).(LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER on In Forma Pauperis Status - #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4). Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/6/2019 (copy mailed to plaintiff). (LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/06/2019)

2 #2

Envelope

2 #1

Inmate Trust Account

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TYLER NEAL JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Attachments

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, SCOTT, filed by TYLER NEAL JOHNSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope)(LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER DENYING #14 Motion for Appointment of Counsel without prejudice. When determining whether to recruit counsel to assist an indigent plaintiff, the Court must first consider whether the plaintiff has made reasonable attempts to secure counsel on his own, and, if so, whether the difficulty of the case factually and legally exceeds his capacity as a layperson to present it. Navejar v. Iyiola, 718 F.3d 692, 696 (7th Cir. 2013) (citing Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654 (7th Cir. 2007)). In support of the motion, Plaintiff simply states that he has no means to seek and/or contact counsel. He discloses no efforts to locate counsel and identifies no impediments to self-representation.Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 7/1/2019. (jsy)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Tyler Neal Johnson. (jsm2) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2019. (jaj) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER DISMISSING #12 First Amended Complaint without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a "Second Amended Complaint" on or before July 18, 2019. Should Plaintiff fail to file a Second Amended Complaint within the allotted time or consistent with the instructions set forth in this Order, the entire case shall be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with a court order and/or for failure to prosecute his claims. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The dismissal shall also count as one of Plaintiff's three allotted "strikes" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 6/20/2019. (jsy) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mack, McKinnon, Nancy, Scott filed by Tyler Neal Johnson.(jsm2) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jsm2) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2019. (jsm2) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER DISMISSING #1 Complaint (including COUNTS 1 and 2) without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a "First Amended Complaint" on or before April 29, 2019. Should Plaintiff fail to file a First Amended Complaint within the allotted time or consistent with the instructions set forth in this Order, the entire case shall be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with a court order and/or for failure to prosecute his claims. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Ladien v. Astrachan, 128 F.3d 1051 (7th Cir. 1997); Johnson v. Kamminga, 34 F.3d 466 (7th Cir. 1994); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The dismissal shall also count as one of Plaintiffs three allotted "strikes" under 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 4/1/2019. (jsy) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE AND ORDER: This Court has received your Complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee from the Southern District of Indiana, previously assigned case number: 19-cv-38-RLY-DML. Your new case number is 19-cv-348-JPG. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. The Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims. See: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. A copy of the Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge form is attached to this Order. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge J. Phil Gilbert on 3/26/2019. (jsm2) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00038. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Southern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Southern District of Illinois, on March 26, 2019. (LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CLOSED TRANSFER to Southern District of Illinois at Benton. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/26/2019 (copy mailed to plaintiff).(LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by TYLER NEAL JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER on In Forma Pauperis Status - #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The assessment of even an initial partial filing fee is waived because the plaintiff has no assets and no means by which to pay a partial filing fee. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(4). Accordingly, no initial partial filing fee is due at this time. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 3/6/2019 (copy mailed to plaintiff). (LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 03/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff TYLER NEAL JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Trust Account, #2 Envelope)(LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, SCOTT, filed by TYLER NEAL JOHNSON. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Envelope)(LBT) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 3/26/2019.] (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less