This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 08:26:58 (UTC).

JOHNSON v. SCI-PINE GROVE et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 JOHNSON filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against SCI-PINE GROVE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa Pupo Lenihan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00064

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lisa Pupo Lenihan

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SOLOMON JOHNSON

Greensburg, PA 15601-9103

Respondents

E. SCI-Pine Grove

E. Ray

SUPERINTENDENT ALBION SCI

Jackson, M.D.

Medical Provider Company

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF. No. #5 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may submit another motion to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. If that resubmitted motion is granted, the case will be reopened. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may reopen the case by paying the $402.00 filing fee. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to Local Rule 72.C.2. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days may constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/27/2022. (jmb) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to US District Court, Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/12/22. (ms) Document added to replace Main, which does not display due to ECF error. Modified text on 1/13/2022. (cww) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER vacating and withdrawing #7 Report and Recommendations. For good cause shown and upon finding excusable neglect, the plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed ifp (Doc. 5) is DEEMED timely fi led. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/12/22 (ms) Document added to replace Main, which does not display due to ECF error. Modified text on 1/13/2022. (cww) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-02052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

#9

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

2 #4

*Restricted*

2 #3

398 Form

2 #2

Fed & Local Rules

2 #1

Instruction Sheet

#2

(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (Attachments: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Fed & Local Rules, #3 398 Form, #4 399 Forms) (lp) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF. No. #5 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may submit another motion to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. If that resubmitted motion is granted, the case will be reopened. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may reopen the case by paying the $402.00 filing fee. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to Local Rule 72.C.2. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days may constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/27/2022. (jmb) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Middle; Case Number 3:21-cv-02052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to US District Court, Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/12/22. (ms) Document added to replace Main, which does not display due to ECF error. Modified text on 1/13/2022. (cww) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER vacating and withdrawing #7 Report and Recommendations. For good cause shown and upon finding excusable neglect, the plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed ifp (Doc. 5) is DEEMED timely fi led. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/12/22 (ms) Document added to replace Main, which does not display due to ECF error. Modified text on 1/13/2022. (cww) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) [VACATED AND WITHDRAWN PER DOC. 8 ORDER] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Solomon Johnson, #1 Complaint filed by Solomon Johnson. Accordingly, we recommend that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the requisite filing and administrative fees and that the Clerk be directed to administratively close this case. See Lindsey v. Roman, 408 Fed. Appx 530, 53233 (3d Cir. 2010) (per curiam); Parker v. Harrisburg City, Civil No. 1:17-CV-00653, 2017 WL 3015880, at *2 (M.D. Pa. June 7, 2017), report and recommendation adopted by 2017 WL 3008583 (M.D. Pa. July 14, 2017). Objections to R&R due by 1/28/2022 Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 1/11/22. (ms) Modified on 1/12/2022 (ms). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORMS SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFF. (dw) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Solomon Johnson.(dw) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCUMENT FILED entitled "Notice Request" with attached exhibits by Solomon Johnson. (dw) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 12/07/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (Attachments: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Fed & Local Rules, #3 398 Form, #4 399 Forms) (lp) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Solomon Johnson.(lp) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MEDICAL PROVIDERS is a litigant

Latest cases where JACKSON is a litigant