This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 06:37:08 (UTC).

Johnson v. Schneider National, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Johnson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Schneider National, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William C Griesbach. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00836

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William C Griesbach

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Johnson

Defendant

Schneider National Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Simon

Attorney at Law Offices of Simon & Simon

5000 Rockside Rd - Ste 520

Independence, OH 44131

Defendant Attorneys

Joel H Spitz

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

77 W Wacker Dr - Ste 4100

Chicago, IL 60601-1815

Michael R Phillips

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

77 W Wacker Dr - Ste 4100

Chicago, IL 60601-1815

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/22/2022. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, the Court's 3/21/2022, #23 judgment is VACATED. The parties' settlement agreement is approved and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

#31

(#31) ORDER of USCA re #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Johnson. This appeal is REMANDED to the district court pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12.1(b) for proceedings consistent with its order issued on June 1, 2022. (mac)

#30

(#30) ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/1/2022 granting #29 joint motion for an indicative ruling. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1, the Court indicates that, upon remand, it would enter an order approving the parties' negotiated settlement of Plaintiff's claims and dismiss this action with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

29 #1

Exhibit - Fully Executed Settlement Agreement

#29

(#29) Joint Rule 62.1 MOTION for Indicative Ruling by Schneider National Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Fully Executed Settlement Agreement)(Phillips, Michael) Modified text on 5/26/2022 (lh).

#28

(#28) Docketing Statement by Robert Johnson re #24 Notice of Appeal (cc: all counsel) (Simon, James)

#27

(#27) USCA Case Number 22-1556 re: #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Johnson. (mac)

#24

(#24) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #22 Decision and Order, #23 Judgment by Robert Johnson. Filing Fee PAID $505, receipt number AWIEDC-4081644 (cc: all counsel) (Simon, James)

#23

(#23) JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 3/21/22. (cc: all counsel)(lh)

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

"EXHIBIT C"

1 #2

"EXHIBIT B"

1 #1

"EXHIBIT A"

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/22/2022. Pursuant to the agreement of the parties, the Court's 3/21/2022, #23 judgment is VACATED. The parties' settlement agreement is approved and this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER of USCA re #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Johnson. This appeal is REMANDED to the district court pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 12.1(b) for proceedings consistent with its order issued on June 1, 2022. (mac)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 6/1/2022 granting #29 joint motion for an indicative ruling. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62.1, the Court indicates that, upon remand, it would enter an order approving the parties' negotiated settlement of Plaintiff's claims and dismiss this action with prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Joint Rule 62.1 MOTION for Indicative Ruling by Schneider National Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Fully Executed Settlement Agreement)(Phillips, Michael) Modified text on 5/26/2022 (lh).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Docketing Statement by Robert Johnson re #24 Notice of Appeal (cc: all counsel) (Simon, James)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) USCA Case Number 22-1556 re: #24 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Johnson. (mac)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #24 Notice of Appeal. (tlf)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Attorney Cover Letter re: #24 Notice of Appeal. (tlf)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #22 Decision and Order, #23 Judgment by Robert Johnson. Filing Fee PAID $505, receipt number AWIEDC-4081644 (cc: all counsel) (Simon, James)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk approved by Judge William C Griesbach on 3/21/22. (cc: all counsel)(lh)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Schneider National Inc. (Phillips, Michael)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel H Spitz on behalf of Schneider National Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Joel H. Spitz (Spitz, Joel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael R Phillips on behalf of Schneider National Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Michael R. Phillips (Phillips, Michael)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy E Beverlin on behalf of Schneider National Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Amy E. Beverlin (Beverlin, Amy)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Kane on behalf of Schneider National Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Matthew C. Kane (Kane, Matthew)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Johnson. Schneider National Inc served on 7/28/2021. (Simon, James)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re #1 Complaint. All attachments to documents should include a brief description of the attachment - Ex A - Initial Contract, Ex B - Doe Deposition, Ex C - 2006 Sales Figures, etc. This document does not need to be refiled. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (tlf)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Schneider National Inc. (tlf)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Schneider National, Inc. by Robert Johnson. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3865332) (Attachments: #1 "Exhibit A", #2 "Exhibit B", #3 "Exhibit C", #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Simon, James)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schneider National, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel H Spitz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael R. Phillips