This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2021 at 10:48:57 (UTC).

JOHNSON v. RES-CARE, INC

Case Summary

On 01/26/2021 JOHNSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against RES-CARE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Young and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard L. Young

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENNIFER JOHNSON

Defendant

RES-CARE, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lauren Elizabeth Berger

Attorney at BIESECKER DUTKANYCH & MACER LLC (Evansville)

411 Main St.

Evansville, IN 47708

Defendant Attorneys

Alan L. McLaughlin

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Bianca Black

Attorney at LITTLER MENDELSON, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 702

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty days of this date, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/23/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#8

(#8) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/25/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant RES-CARE, INC. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca Black on behalf of Defendant RES-CARE, INC. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. McLaughlin on behalf of Defendant RES-CARE, INC. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to RES-CARE, INC. (AAS) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Berger on behalf of Plaintiff JENNIFER JOHNSON. (Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Res-Care

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against RES-CARE, INC, filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6384475) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Res-Care, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that within thirty days of this date, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 3/23/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2021 at 10:30 AM (Central Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 2/25/2021.(JRB) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant RES-CARE, INC. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca Black on behalf of Defendant RES-CARE, INC. (Black, Bianca) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. McLaughlin on behalf of Defendant RES-CARE, INC. (McLaughlin, Alan) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AAS) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to RES-CARE, INC. (AAS) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Berger on behalf of Plaintiff JENNIFER JOHNSON. (Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against RES-CARE, INC, filed by JENNIFER JOHNSON. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6384475) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons - Res-Care, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Berger, Lauren) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RES-CARE INC. A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Elizabeth Berger