This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/08/2021 at 08:55:50 (UTC).

Johnson v. Rainbow International LLC

Case Summary

On 02/02/2020 Johnson filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Rainbow International LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00082

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Geoff Johnson

Defendant

Rainbow International LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard Paul Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorney

Kirstie M. Simmerman

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Geoff Johnson. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Geoff Johnson (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#5

(#5) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (am) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rainbow International LLC (Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Rainbow International LLC. (am) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Geoff Johnson. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2020)

1 #4

Copyright Form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13153259). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Geoff Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Geoff Johnson. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Geoff Johnson (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (am) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Rainbow International LLC (Simmerman, Kirstie) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Rainbow International LLC. (am) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Geoff Johnson. (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13153259). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Geoff Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Copyright Form)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 02/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAINBOW INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirstie Morgan Simmerman