This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2021 at 08:29:48 (UTC).

Johnson v. QuikTrip Corporation

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against QuikTrip Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reed C. O'Connor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00712

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reed C. O'Connor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tamara Renee Johnson

Defendant

QuikTrip Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John David Milks

Attorney at Slocumb Law Firm, PLLC

4004 Belt Line Road, Suite 100

Addison, TX 75001

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher M Blanton

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

B Kyle Briscoe

Attorney at Peavler|Briscoe

2215 Westgate Plaza

Grapevine, TX 76051

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning May 9, 2022 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Joinder of Parties due by 8/27/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2021. Motions due by 1/10/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/10/2021. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/14/2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/29/2021) (pef) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#5

(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER...The Joint Report, which shall be filed on or before June 30, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/2/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

1 #4

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #3

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #2

Exhibit(s)

1 #1

Additional Page(s)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11942796) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet Supplement, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning May 9, 2022 before Judge Reed C. O'Connor. Joinder of Parties due by 8/27/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 8/27/2021. Motions due by 1/10/2022. Deadline for mediation is on or before 11/10/2021. Discovery due by 12/10/2021. Pretrial Order due by 4/14/2022. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/29/2021) (pef) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER...The Joint Report, which shall be filed on or before June 30, 2021. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 6/2/2021) (wxc) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge O Connor. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (wxc) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QuikTrip Corporation. (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by QuikTrip Corporation. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-11942796) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Cover Sheet Supplement, #4 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Briscoe, B) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where QuikTrip Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John David Milks