This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:36:13 (UTC).

Johnson v. Progressive.Com et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Progressive Com. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11202

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

 

Party Details

Defendants

Axxcess Insurance Agencies Ltd.

Sunrise

Progressive Claims Department

Progressive

Matt Newman

New York Automobile Insurance Plan

Victoria Fire & Casualty Company

Progressive.Com

Jesse Clipper Square

State of New York

NYSDOT

Allstate

Chevrolet

Geico

Sunrise Liqours

State of Illinois

Arizona Premium Finance

Nationwide

Global Libery Insurance Company

City of Phoenix Arizona

9 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/8/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#1

(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert W. Johnson.(rdz) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against AAA, Adesa, Allstate, Arizona Premium Finance, Axxcess Insurance Agencies Ltd., Buffalo Park System, Chevrolet, Chevrolet Impala, City of Phoenix Arizona, Geico, Global Liberty Insurance, Global Liberty Policy # FHP07355440, Global Libery Insurance Company, Jesse Clipper Square, Rosemary Keenan, NYSDOT, Nationwide, New York Automobile Insurance Plan, Matt Newman, Progressive, Progressive Claims Department, Progressive.Com, State Farm, State of Illinois, State of New York, Sunrise, Sunrise Liqours, Victoria Fire & Casualty Company. Document filed by Robert W. Johnson.(rdz) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Robert W. Johnson 3345 Fish Ave. Apt. 1 Bronx, NY 10469. (aea) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/8/2020) (va) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against AAA, Adesa, Allstate, Arizona Premium Finance, Axxcess Insurance Agencies Ltd., Buffalo Park System, Chevrolet, Chevrolet Impala, City of Phoenix Arizona, Geico, Global Liberty Insurance, Global Liberty Policy # FHP07355440, Global Libery Insurance Company, Jesse Clipper Square, Rosemary Keenan, NYSDOT, Nationwide, New York Automobile Insurance Plan, Matt Newman, Progressive, Progressive Claims Department, Progressive.Com, State Farm, State of Illinois, State of New York, Sunrise, Sunrise Liqours, Victoria Fire & Casualty Company. Document filed by Robert W. Johnson.(rdz) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert W. Johnson.(rdz) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.