This case was last updated from PACER on 09/23/2021 at 13:53:28 (UTC).

Johnson v. Prisoner Transportation Services Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Prisoner Transportation Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lynn Adelman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00254

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lynn Adelman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Larry B Johnson

Defendants

Prisoner Transportation Services Inc

US Corrections LLC

Florida Automobile Joint Underwriting Association

PTS Wisconsin LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard H Schulz

Attorney at Schulz Legal Services LLC

11063 W Bluemound Rd

Wauwatosa, WI 53226

John S Lopatto, III

Attorney at Law Offices of John Lopatto III

1776 K St Nw - Ste 700

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorneys

John J Reid

Attorney at Cassiday Schade LLP

330 E Kilbourn Ave - Ste 575

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Ruth E Goldwater McCoy

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 W Adams St - Ste 300

Chicago, IL 60661

Timothy J Young

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 W Adams St - Ste 300

Chicago, IL 60661

Ronald Payne

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 W Adams St - Ste 300

Chicago, IL 60661

Mark F Wolfe

Attorney at Traub Lieberman Straus & Shrewsberry LLP

303 W Madison St - Ste 1200

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Larry B Johnson. (Lopatto, John)

#21

(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/5/21. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on September 17, 2021 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION to Continue July 8, 2021 Scheduling Conference by Larry B Johnson. (Lopatto, John)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Substitution by Mark F Wolfe on behalf of Florida Automobile Joint Underwriting Association. Additional Attorney(s) appearing: Mark F. Wolfe; Attorney Attorneys Ronald Payne, Ruth E. Goldwater McCoy, and Timothy J. Young to be termed. (Wolfe, Mark)

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/18/21. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on July 8, 2021 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

17 #4

Exhibit 4 - Business Entity Records of PT Solutions Holdings, LLC

17 #2

Exhibit 2 - Record from Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions

17 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Joel Brasfield

#17

(#17) AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Defendants. Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Joel Brasfield, #2 Exhibit 2 - Record from Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions, #3 Exhibit 3 - Business Entity Records of PT Solutions, LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Business Entity Records of PT Solutions Holdings, LLC, #5 Notice of Filing w/ COS)(Young, Timothy)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Remand with Request for Compressed Briefing Schedule by Larry B Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jan. 2021 Signed Order Amending Scheduling Order State Court Case)(Lopatto, John)

1 #7

Exhibit E- Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Written Discovery

1 #6

Exhibit D- State Court Record

1 #5

Exhibit C- State Affidavits of Service

1 #4

Exhibit B- State Appearance and Answer

1 #3

Exhibit A- State Summons and Complaint

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Declaration of John Reid

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prisoner Transportation Services Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 20cv2056 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3747924) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John Reid, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- State Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B- State Appearance and Answer, #5 Exhibit C- State Affidavits of Service, #6 Exhibit D- State Court Record, #7 Exhibit E- Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Written Discovery)(Reid, John) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/26/2021) (jcl).

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Larry B Johnson. (Lopatto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 8/5/21. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on September 17, 2021 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDocket Annotation - The 7/8/21 telephonic scheduling conference has been cancelled and may be reset at a later date. (jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Consent MOTION to Continue July 8, 2021 Scheduling Conference by Larry B Johnson. (Lopatto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Substitution by Mark F Wolfe on behalf of Florida Automobile Joint Underwriting Association. Additional Attorney(s) appearing: Mark F. Wolfe; Attorney Attorneys Ronald Payne, Ruth E. Goldwater McCoy, and Timothy J. Young to be termed. (Wolfe, Mark)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 5/18/21. IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) scheduling conference will be held on July 8, 2021 at 11:15 a.m. The court will initiate the call. The participation of the attorney who will be handling the case is required and their telephone number should be provided in the Rule 26(f) report. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED DOCUMENT by All Defendants. Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Joel Brasfield, #2 Exhibit 2 - Record from Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions, #3 Exhibit 3 - Business Entity Records of PT Solutions, LLC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Business Entity Records of PT Solutions Holdings, LLC, #5 Notice of Filing w/ COS)(Young, Timothy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Payne on behalf of Florida Automobile Joint Underwriting Association, PTS Wisconsin LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services Inc, US Corrections LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Ronald W. Payne (Payne, Ronald)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/28/21 that the plaintiff's motion to remand is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for a compressed briefing schedule is DENIED as MOOT. Defendant shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file an amended notice of removal that identifies the citizenships of the members of the LLC defendants. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 4/28/21 granting #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John J Reid terminated. (cc: all counsel)(jad)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J Young on behalf of Florida Automobile Joint Underwriting Association, PTS Wisconsin LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services Inc, US Corrections LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy J. Young (Young, Timothy)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Ruth E Goldwater McCoy on behalf of Florida Automobile Joint Underwriting Association, PTS Wisconsin LLC, Prisoner Transportation Services Inc, US Corrections LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Ruth E. Goldwater McCoy (Goldwater McCoy, Ruth)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE Statement by Prisoner Transportation Services Inc. (Reid, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE Statement by Prisoner Transportation Services Inc. (Reid, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE Statement by Prisoner Transportation Services Inc. (Reid, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Larry B Johnson. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Lopatto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE Statement by Larry B Johnson. (Lopatto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Remand with Request for Compressed Briefing Schedule by Larry B Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jan. 2021 Signed Order Amending Scheduling Order State Court Case)(Lopatto, John)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available #here. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (jcl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Prisoner Transportation Services Inc from Milwaukee County Circuit Court, Case Number: 20cv2056 with attached state court documents. (Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-3747924) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of John Reid, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A- State Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit B- State Appearance and Answer, #5 Exhibit C- State Affidavits of Service, #6 Exhibit D- State Court Record, #7 Exhibit E- Plaintiff's Responses to Defendants Written Discovery)(Reid, John) (Attachment 2 replaced on 2/26/2021) (jcl).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where FLORIDA AUTOMOBILE JOINT UNDERWRITING ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruth E. Goldwater McCoy