This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2022 at 07:14:44 (UTC).

JOHNSON v. PERRY et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2022 JOHNSON filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against PERRY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are MARK E WALKER and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00306

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E WALKER

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE M JOHNSON

Crawfordville, FL 32327

Defendants

PERRY

T THOMAS

COX

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against COX, PERRY, T THOMAS, filed by LEE M JOHNSON. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LEE M JOHNSON. (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice to Pro Se (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of court shall assess Plaintiff $29.08 as an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). Plaintiff shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date this order is docketed in which to submit the initial partial filing fee as assessed by the clerk of court. The clerk of court is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. (Fee due by 9/21/2022.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/22/2022. (jcw)(cc: FDOC) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by LEE M JOHNSON. (jcw) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/26/2022. (jcw) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Notice of Returned Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #7 Mail Returned. (jcw) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to LEE M JOHNSON Re: #6 ORDER. Notice mailed to FLORIDA STATE PRISON, PO BOX 800, RAIFORD, FL 32083. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Returned Mail) (jcw) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - Filing fee was not received per Finance. (jcw) (Entered: 10/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 9/26/2022. (jcw) (Entered: 09/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Reconsideration re #4 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, by LEE M JOHNSON. (jcw) (Entered: 09/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of court shall assess Plaintiff $29.08 as an initial partial filing fee as provided in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). Plaintiff shall have THIRTY (30) DAYS from the date this order is docketed in which to submit the initial partial filing fee as assessed by the clerk of court. The clerk of court is directed to MAIL a copy of this order, with the appropriate cover letter to: Department of Corrections, 501 South Calhoun St., Tallahassee, FL 32399-2500, Attention: Agency Clerk. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. (Fee due by 9/21/2022.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/22/2022. (jcw)(cc: FDOC) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice to Pro Se (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LEE M JOHNSON. (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against COX, PERRY, T THOMAS, filed by LEE M JOHNSON. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cox, A/K/A Mary Frances is a litigant

Latest cases where PERRY(B) is a litigant