Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/22/2019 at 07:41:45 (UTC).

Johnson v. Ohio Department of Rehabilitations and Corrections,et al

Case Summary

On 05/23/2019 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Ohio Department of Rehabilitations and Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephanie K. Bowman and Susan J. Dlott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00384

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephanie K. Bowman

Presiding Judge

Susan J. Dlott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alonzo Johnson, r

Chillicothe, OH 45601

Defendants

Kathy Burns

Ohio Department of Rehabilitations and Corrections

Chillicothe Correctional Institution

Lebanon Correctional Institution

Corrections Reception Center

State of Ohio

Behavioral Health Service

Scioto County Jail

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/26/19. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the full $400 fee ($350 filing fee and $50administrative fee) required to commence this action within 30 days. Plaintiff is hereby notified that his failure to pay the $400 fee within 30 days will result in the dismissal of this action.( Show Cause Response due by 7/29/2019.) (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

#5

(#5) OBJECTION to #2 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Alonzo Johnson, r. (eh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#4

(#4) In forma Pauperis Affidavit of Indigency by Plaintiff Alonzo Johnson, r. (eh) Modified on 6/13/2019 (eh). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Response to #2 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Alonzo Johnson, r. (eh) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#2

(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/31/2019. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: Plaintiff be ordered to pay the full $400 fee ($350 filing fee plus $50 administrative fee) required to commence this action within thirty (30) days, and that plaintiff be notified that his failure to pay the full $400 fee within thirty days will result in the dismissal of his action. Objections to R&R due by 6/14/2019. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/26/19. Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the full $400 fee ($350 filing fee and $50administrative fee) required to commence this action within 30 days. Plaintiff is hereby notified that his failure to pay the $400 fee within 30 days will result in the dismissal of this action.( Show Cause Response due by 7/29/2019.) (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) OBJECTION to #2 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Alonzo Johnson, r. (eh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) In forma Pauperis Affidavit of Indigency by Plaintiff Alonzo Johnson, r. (eh) Modified on 6/13/2019 (eh). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Response to #2 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Alonzo Johnson, r. (eh) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman on 5/31/2019. IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT: Plaintiff be ordered to pay the full $400 fee ($350 filing fee plus $50 administrative fee) required to commence this action within thirty (30) days, and that plaintiff be notified that his failure to pay the full $400 fee within thirty days will result in the dismissal of his action. Objections to R&R due by 6/14/2019. (eh)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Alonzo Johnson, r against All Defendants. (Case received as scanned without fee, IFP motion, copies of the complaint, or formal summons and USM-285 forms. (Attachments: #1 Service Forms) (eh) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chillicothe Correctional Institution is a litigant

Latest cases where Ohio Department of Rehabilitation & Corrections is a litigant

Latest cases where BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICES INC. is a litigant