This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2021 at 07:40:04 (UTC).

Johnson v. Nurture, Inc.,

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Johnson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nurture, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Kay Vyskocil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07283

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ahkilah Johnson

Defendants

Nurture, Inc,, d/b/a Happy Family Brands

Nurture, Inc., doing business as Happy Family Brands

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Steven Graifman

Attorney at Kantrowitz Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.

747 Chestnut Ridge Road

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

Defendant Attorney

Colleen Gulliver

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP (NY)

1251 Avenue Of The Americas, 27Th Floor

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#15

RESTRICTED

#16

#4

(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-01217. Document filed by Ahkilah Johnson..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nurture, Inc.,..(pc) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action shall be consolidated with In re Nurture Baby Food Litigation, No. 21-cv-1217-MKV. The deadlines set forth in the Order of Consolidation govern. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/1/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV, 1:21-cv-07283-MKV (rj) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Nurture, Inc., waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Document filed by Ahkilah Johnson..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#10

(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the complaint in Johnson v. Nurture Inc., Case No. 1:21-cv-7283-MKV addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated October 19, 2021. Document filed by Nurture, Inc.,, Nurture, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV, 1:21-cv-07283-MKV.(Gulliver, Colleen) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to the complaint in Johnson v. Nurture Inc., Case No. 1:21-cv-7283-MKV addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated October 19, 2021. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/20/2021) (va) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#12

(#12) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (73 in 1:21-cv-01217-MKV) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Melissa S. Weiner and Michael Reese as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Melissa Emert, Annick M. Persinger, Jason P. Sultzer, Charles E. Schaffer, and Rachel Soffin as Interim Executive Committee members. . Document filed by Jessica Strobel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al..(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (73 in 1:21-cv-01217-MKV) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Melissa S. Weiner and Michael Reese as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Melissa Emert, Annick M. Persinger, Jason P. Sultzer, Charles E. Schaffer, and Rachel Soffin as Interim Executive Committee members. . Document filed by Jessica Strobel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al..(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to the complaint in Johnson v. Nurture Inc., Case No. 1:21-cv-7283-MKV addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated October 19, 2021. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/20/2021) (va) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the complaint in Johnson v. Nurture Inc., Case No. 1:21-cv-7283-MKV addressed to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil from Colleen Carey Gulliver dated October 19, 2021. Document filed by Nurture, Inc.,, Nurture, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV, 1:21-cv-07283-MKV.(Gulliver, Colleen) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 8/27/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 8/27/2021 before Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/25/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2022.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al..(Moya, Goretti) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Nurture, Inc., waiver sent on 8/31/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. Document filed by Ahkilah Johnson..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action shall be consolidated with In re Nurture Baby Food Litigation, No. 21-cv-1217-MKV. The deadlines set forth in the Order of Consolidation govern. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 9/1/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV, 1:21-cv-07283-MKV (rj) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-cv-01217-MKV.. (rj) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-01217-MKV. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nurture, Inc.,..(pc) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil as possibly related to 21cv1217. (pc) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gary Steven Graifman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Ahkilah Johnson, Nurture, Inc,, d/b/a Happy Family Brands. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias party name was omitted;. (pc) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-01217. Document filed by Ahkilah Johnson..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nurture, Inc. d/b/a Happy Family Brands, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Ahkilah Johnson..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nurture, Inc,, d/b/a Happy Family Brands. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24999687)Document filed by Ahkilah Johnson..(Graifman, Gary) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nurture, Inc. is a litigant