This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/20/2020 at 11:07:41 (UTC).

Johnson v. Nguyen et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2020 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Nguyen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-04932

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Johnson

Defendants

DOES 1-10,

Hung Quoc Nguyen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Prathima Reddy Price

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Catherine Mary Corfee

Attorney at Corfee Stone Law Corporation, PC

P.O. Box 1098

Carmichael, CA 95609

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hung Quoc Nguyen (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#18

(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hung Quoc Nguyen.. (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/12/2020) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Hung Quoc Nguyen (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/12/2020) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byHung Quoc Nguyen. (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/12/2020) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY AND #14 MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/09/2020. (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#14

(#14) First MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Hung Quoc Nguyen. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/9/2020) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Hung Quoc Nguyen. (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/8/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

11 #2

Certificate/Proof of Service

11 #1

Declaration

9 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

7 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#7

(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Hung Quoc Nguyen. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Certificate of Interested Entities by Hung Quoc Nguyen (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/15/2020) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter al l affiliates or corporate parents.Please re-file in its entirety Using the Certificate of Interested Entities Event. Re: #17 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment filed by Hung Quoc Nguyen (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2020) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hung Quoc Nguyen.. (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/12/2020) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Hung Quoc Nguyen (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/12/2020) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byHung Quoc Nguyen. (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/12/2020) (Entered: 09/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER GRANTING #13 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY AND #14 MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/09/2020. (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) First MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Hung Quoc Nguyen. Responses due by 9/14/2020. (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/9/2020) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Hung Quoc Nguyen. (Corfee, Catherine) (Filed on 9/8/2020) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Clerk's Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hung Quoc Nguyen. (Related documents(s) #11 )(pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2020) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Entry of Default As to Hung Quoc Nguyen only filed by Scott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/31/2020) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Hung Quoc Nguyen served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/21/2020) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Beth Labson Freemanfor all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as Referral Judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 7/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Hung Quoc Nguyen. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2020) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14724593.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 7/22/2020) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine Mary Corfee