This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 05:50:09 (UTC).

Johnson v. Monsanto Company et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00245

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tina Johnson

Defendants

John Does

Monsanto Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle P. Ludwig

Attorney at Ludwig Law Firm, PLC

1217 West Third Street

Little Rock, AR 72201

Gene A Ludwig

Attorney at Ludwig Law Firm PLC

1 Three Rivers Drive

Little Rock, AR 72223

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Tina Johnson (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075286.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#2

(#2) AFFIDAVIT as to Unknown Tortfeasors by Tina Johnson. (ajt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#4

(#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-177) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2741 In Re: Roundup Products Liability.. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 1/6/2020. (jak) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Tina Johnson. Monsanto Company served on 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B to Affidavit of Service)(Ludwig, Kyle) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#5

(#5) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00915. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A-B to Affidavit of Service

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • MEMBER CASE OPENED: Arkansas Eastern, 19-915, Johnson v. Monsanto Company et al, Opened in California Northern District as 20-245 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 177 cc: JPMDL (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00915. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-177) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court Northern District of California as part of MDL No. 2741 In Re: Roundup Products Liability.. Signed by the Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 1/6/2020. (jak) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint , filed by Tina Johnson. Monsanto Company served on 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B to Affidavit of Service)(Ludwig, Kyle) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AFFIDAVIT as to Unknown Tortfeasors by Tina Johnson. (ajt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Tina Johnson (Fee $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075286.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.