This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2022 at 07:14:36 (UTC).

Johnson v. Merchants' Credit Guide Co.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 Johnson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Merchants' Credit Guide Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Manish S. Shah. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00448

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manish S. Shah

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark D Johnson

Defendant

Merchants' Credit Guide Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Scott Davidson

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph P. Doyle, LLC

105 South Roselle Road, Suite 203

Schaumburg, IL 60193

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark D Johnson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19092055. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark D Johnson by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark D Johnson. Merchants' Credit Guide Co. waiver sent on 1/26/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Mark D Johnson of Settlement (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark D Johnson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #5 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Pursuant to the notice of voluntary dismissal #5 , this case is dismissed with prejudice. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark D Johnson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Mark D Johnson of Settlement (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Mark D Johnson. Merchants' Credit Guide Co. waiver sent on 1/26/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Merchants' Credit Guide Co. (dxb, ) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached #Consent To# form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (jmk, ) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jmk, ) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark D Johnson by Joseph Scott Davidson (Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Mark D Johnson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-19092055. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davidson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Merchants Credit Guide Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Scott Davidson