This case was last updated from PACER on 07/19/2019 at 07:29:22 (UTC).

Johnson v. LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, Esq., et al.

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Johnson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, Esq . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Thomas G. Wilson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-01239

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Virginia M. Hernandez Covington

Referral Judge

Thomas G. Wilson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WAYNE JOHNSON

Defendants

KEYSTONE AUTOMOTIVE INDUSTRIES, INC.

LKQ PICK YOUR PART SOUTHEAST, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ryan D. Barack

Attorney at Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC

304 S. Belcher Rd., Suite C

Clearwater, FL 33765

Michelle E. Nadeau

Attorney at Kwall Barack Nadeau PLLC

304 S. Belcher Rd., Suite C

Clearwater, FL 33765

Defendant Attorney

Craig R. Annunziata

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips, LLP

Suite 3450, 10 S Wacker Dr

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LKQ Corporation for LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC.. (Annunziata, Craig) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LKQ Corporation for Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc... (Annunziata, Craig) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#11

(#11) Joint Stipulation for Arbitration and Stay of Proceedings by Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC. (Annunziata, Craig) Modified event and text on 6/18/2019 (KMM). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Annunziata on behalf of Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC (Annunziata, Craig) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wayne Johnson. Related case(s): No (Barack, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) RETURN of service executed on May 28, 2019 by Wayne Johnson as to LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC. (Barack, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#6

(#6) RETURN of service executed on May 28, 2019 by Wayne Johnson as to Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc.. (Barack, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC. (KMM) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

1 #3

Proposed Summons Keystone Automotive Industries

1 #2

Proposed Summons LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC and Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15484611) filed by Wayne Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons )(Barack, Ryan) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (KMM). (Entered: 05/20/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation for arbitration and stay of proceedings (Doc. #11), this case is referred to binding arbitration as outlined by the parties, and stayed and administratively closed during the arbitration process. The parties are directed to file a joint status report every 120 days. They are also directed to immediately notify the Court upon the completion of the arbitration process. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case and stay all deadlines. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/18/2019. (DMD) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC identifying Corporate Parent LKQ Corporation for LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC.. (Annunziata, Craig) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LKQ Corporation for Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc... (Annunziata, Craig) (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Joint Stipulation for Arbitration and Stay of Proceedings by Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC. (Annunziata, Craig) Modified event and text on 6/18/2019 (KMM). (Entered: 06/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Craig R. Annunziata on behalf of Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC (Annunziata, Craig) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Wayne Johnson. Related case(s): No (Barack, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • (#8) ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by July 2, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/3/2019. (DMD) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN of service executed on May 28, 2019 by Wayne Johnson as to LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC. (Barack, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of service executed on May 28, 2019 by Wayne Johnson as to Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc.. (Barack, Ryan) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2019. (TWL) (Entered: 05/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC. (KMM) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1239-T-33TGW. (SJB) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LKQ Pick Your Part Southeast, LLC and Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15484611) filed by Wayne Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons )(Barack, Ryan) Modified text on 5/21/2019 (KMM). (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LKQ PICK YOUR PART SOUTHEAST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KEYSTONE AUTOMOTIVE INDUSTRIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle E. Nadeau