This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:33:38 (UTC).

Johnson v. Kirkpatrick et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Kirkpatrick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Z. Lee and Lisa A. Jensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-50005

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Z. Lee

Referral Judge

Lisa A. Jensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antoine Lamont Johnson

Thomson, IL 61285

Defendants

T. Kirkpatrick

Warden

Lyons

Ingram

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER: To proceed with this case, Plaintiff must satisfy the Court's filing fee requirements. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit an in forma pauperis application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of Plaintiff's prison trust fund statement showing activity in his account for the six months immediately preceding the filing of his complaint; or (2) pre-pay the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to comply with this order by February 14, 2020 will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/21/2020. Mailed notice (smm, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, ) Modified on 1/7/2020 (jp, ). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Antoine Lamont Johnson (pg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Antoine Lamont Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Antoine Lamont Johnson for attorney representation (pg, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Antoine Lamont Johnson for attorney representation (pg, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Antoine Lamont Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (pg, ) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketMAILED a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order to Plaintiff Antoine Lamont Johnson. (smm, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: To proceed with this case, Plaintiff must satisfy the Court's filing fee requirements. Plaintiff is directed to either (1) submit an in forma pauperis application that is certified by a trust fund officer and that includes a copy of Plaintiff's prison trust fund statement showing activity in his account for the six months immediately preceding the filing of his complaint; or (2) pre-pay the $400.00 filing fee. Failure to comply with this order by February 14, 2020 will result in summary dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis and a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/21/2020. Mailed notice (smm, ) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Pursuant to the Fourth Amended General Order 19-0007, dated 6/27/2019, this case is assigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee and referred generally to the Honorable Lisa A. Jensen. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/27/2019. (jp, ) Modified on 1/7/2020 (jp, ). (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (pg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Antoine Lamont Johnson (pg, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less