This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2023 at 09:17:53 (UTC).

JOHNSON v. THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2022 JOHNSON filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre M. Espinosa and Julien Xavier Neals. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07408

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Andre M. Espinosa

Presiding Judge

Julien Xavier Neals

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHELDAN JOHNSON

Defendants

THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY

ANDREW SOLARI

RAOUL DAVILA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CATHERINE WELLINGTON SMITH

Defendant Attorney

MARK A. SALOMAN

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13908110) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHELDAN JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to RAOUL DAVILA, KEURIG DR PEPPER, INC., ANDREW SOLARI, THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHELDAN JOHNSON. THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY waiver sent on 1/16/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHELDAN JOHNSON. RAOUL DAVILA waiver sent on 1/16/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHELDAN JOHNSON. ANDREW SOLARI waiver sent on 1/16/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION RE: CASE CAPTION AND NAMED PARTIES by CHELDAN JOHNSON. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO AMEND; that "Defendant KEURIG Dr. Pepper, Inc.," shall not be included in this action without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to seek leave to add them as party-defendants in this lawsuit at a later time should that party be determined to have been appropriately named. The case caption should be amended to read, "CHELDAN JOHNSON (Plaintiff) v. THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY, ANDREW SOLARI, AND RAOUL DAVILA (Defendants).". Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 2/9/2023. (ld, ) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO AMEND; that "Defendant KEURIG Dr. Pepper, Inc.," shall not be included in this action without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to seek leave to add them as party-defendants in this lawsuit at a later time should that party be determined to have been appropriately named. The case caption should be amended to read, "CHELDAN JOHNSON (Plaintiff) v. THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY, ANDREW SOLARI, AND RAOUL DAVILA (Defendants).". Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 2/9/2023. (ld, ) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION RE: CASE CAPTION AND NAMED PARTIES by CHELDAN JOHNSON. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHELDAN JOHNSON. ANDREW SOLARI waiver sent on 1/16/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHELDAN JOHNSON. RAOUL DAVILA waiver sent on 1/16/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHELDAN JOHNSON. THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY waiver sent on 1/16/2023, answer due 3/17/2023. (SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to RAOUL DAVILA, KEURIG DR PEPPER, INC., ANDREW SOLARI, THE AMERICAN BOTTLING COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 12/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketJudge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa added. (ps) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13908110) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHELDAN JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SMITH, CATHERINE) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less