This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/08/2020 at 09:16:36 (UTC).

Johnson v. IOTAS, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Johnson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against IOTAS, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael W. Mosman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01552

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Mosman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Johnson

Defendant

IOTAS, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel W. Christiansen

Attorney at Vogele & Christiansen

812 Nw 17Th Avenue

Portland, OR 97209

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline Jane Sundbaum

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 S.W. Ninth Ave., Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

Laura E. Rosenbaum

Attorney at Stoel Rives LLP

760 S.W. Ninth Ave., Suite 3000

Portland, OR 97205

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by IOTAS, Inc.. (Sundbaum, Caroline) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#8

(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by IOTAS, Inc.. (Sundbaum, Caroline) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

#6

(#6) Declaration of Caroline Sundbaum In Support of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Filed by IOTAS, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #5 .) (Livett, Caroline) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#5

(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by IOTAS, Inc.. (Livett, Caroline) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#4

(#4) Affidavit of Service upon IOTAS, Inc. served on 10/1/2020 Filed by James Johnson. (Christiansen, Joel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to IOTAS, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7212180. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by James Johnson against IOTAS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Christiansen, Joel) Modified docket text on 9/9/2020 to add payment information. (eo) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by IOTAS, Inc.. (Sundbaum, Caroline) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Answer to #1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by IOTAS, Inc.. (Sundbaum, Caroline) (Entered: 11/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: Unopposed Motion #5 is GRANTED. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading or motion by 11/6/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Declaration of Caroline Sundbaum In Support of Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Filed by IOTAS, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #5 .) (Livett, Caroline) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by IOTAS, Inc.. (Livett, Caroline) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit of Service upon IOTAS, Inc. served on 10/1/2020 Filed by James Johnson. (Christiansen, Joel) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to IOTAS, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/8/2021. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/8/2021. Pretrial Order is due by 2/8/2021. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-7212180. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by James Johnson against IOTAS, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Christiansen, Joel) Modified docket text on 9/9/2020 to add payment information. (eo) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joel W. Christiansen