This case was last updated from PACER on 03/11/2019 at 07:44:07 (UTC).

Johnson v. International Laboratories, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against International Laboratories, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory F. VanTatenhove. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:19-CV-00004

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fran Johnson

Defendants

International Laboratories, LLC

Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hans G. Poppe

Attorney at The Poppe Law Firm

8700 Westport Raod, Suite 201

Louisville, KY 40242

Kirk A. Laughlin

Attorney at The Poppe Law Firm

8700 Westport Raod, Suite 201

Louisville, KY 40242

Defendant Attorneys

William B. Orberson

Attorney at Phillips Parker Orberson & Arnett PLC - Louisville

716 W. Main Street, Suite 300

Louisville, KY 40202

Jane C. Higgins

Attorney at Phillips Parker Orberson & Arnett PLC - Lexington

163 E Main Street, Suite 130

Lexington, KY 40507

Lauren Lea Crosby Thompson

Attorney at Phillips Parker Orberson & Arnett PLC - Lexington

163 E Main Street, Suite 130

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Laboratories, LLC, Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC for International Laboratories, LLC.. (Thompson, Lauren) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

6 #1

Memorandum in Support

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by International Laboratories, LLC, Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Lauren) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

5 #1

Certified Mail Receipt

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED by Fran Johnson: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to International Laboratories, LLC COMPLETED on 2/8/2019. Secretary of State return states this office served the defendant by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail, return receipt requested, on January 17, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(RCB) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

4 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED by Fran Johnson: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC COMPLETED on 2/6/2019. Secretary of State return states this office served the defendant by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail, return receipt requested, on January 17, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(RCB) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to International Laboratories, LLC, Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC; Summons issued and packet returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (TDA) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

1 #5

Summons Quality Packaging Specialists International

1 #4

Summons International Laboratories

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Walmart Letter re Recall

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - FDA Recall

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4257605), filed by Fran Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FDA Recall, #2 Exhibit 2 - Walmart Letter re Recall, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons International Laboratories, #5 Summons Quality Packaging Specialists International) (TDA) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Lauren Thompson re #6 MOTION to Dismiss by International Laboratories, LLC, Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC , #7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1; Error: Signature on document and filer do not match; Entry by attorney; the name of the Filing User under whose login and password the document is filed must be typed in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (RCB) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by International Laboratories, LLC, Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC for International Laboratories, LLC.. (Thompson, Lauren) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by International Laboratories, LLC, Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Thompson, Lauren) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS RETURNED by Fran Johnson: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to International Laboratories, LLC COMPLETED on 2/8/2019. Secretary of State return states this office served the defendant by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail, return receipt requested, on January 17, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt)(RCB) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS RETURNED by Fran Johnson: SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC COMPLETED on 2/6/2019. Secretary of State return states this office served the defendant by sending a copy of the summons and accompanying documents via certified mail, return receipt requested, on January 17, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt)(RCB) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to International Laboratories, LLC, Quality Packaging Specialists International, LLC; Summons issued and packet returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Secretary of State. (TDA) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (TDA) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4257605), filed by Fran Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - FDA Recall, #2 Exhibit 2 - Walmart Letter re Recall, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons International Laboratories, #5 Summons Quality Packaging Specialists International) (TDA) (Entered: 01/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less