This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:59:27 (UTC).

Johnson v. Grisham et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Grisham. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David D. Noce and Stephen R. Clark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03258

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

David D. Noce

Stephen R. Clark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shane William Johnson

Rolla, MO 65401

Defendants

Unknown Shultz

Unknown Kelly

Unknown Grisham

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#5

(#5) PRO SE MOTION for Temporary Restraint by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (KJS) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#6

(#6) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings (KXS) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (DLB) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #1

Original Filing Form

#3

(#3) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (DLB) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #4

Judge Assignment Label

#1

(#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Unknown Grisham, Unknown Kelly, Unknown Shultz Jury Demand,, filed by Shane William Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Envelope, #4 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#9

RESTRICTED

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiff must fully complete the motion, sign it, and return it to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must submit a certified copy of his institution account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. A "certified copy" is one that has been certified by an authorized institution officer that it is a true and correct copy. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the motion being stricken pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and may also result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. Response to Court due by 1/29/2020. (Order and form mailed to plaintiff). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/30/19. (KKS) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (CLO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis under 42:1983 (prisoner) by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CLO) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Court's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty days of the date of this order, plaintiff must fully complete the motion, sign it, and return it to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must submit a certified copy of his institution account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. A "certified copy" is one that has been certified by an authorized institution officer that it is a true and correct copy. Plaintiff's failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the motion being stricken pursuant to Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and may also result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice and without further notice. Response to Court due by 1/29/2020. (Order and form mailed to plaintiff). Signed by District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 12/30/19. (KKS) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DocketORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Thu Dec 26 13:38:02 CST 2019 (Spurgeon, Katherine) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CJRA ORDER (GJL). Magistrate Judge David D. Noce termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Stephen R. Clark for all further proceedings (KXS) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PRO SE MOTION for Temporary Restraint by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (KJS) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#4) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Dec 12 16:03:02 CST 2019 (admin,) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable David D. Noce. (DLB) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (DLB) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Shane William Johnson. (DLB) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT UNDER 42 U.S.C. 1983 against defendant Unknown Grisham, Unknown Kelly, Unknown Shultz Jury Demand,, filed by Shane William Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Envelope, #4 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.