This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2022 at 08:22:57 (UTC).

JOHNSON v. FORT

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 JOHNSON filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against FORT. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC T TREADWELL and CHARLES H WEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00050

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARC T TREADWELL

Referral Judge

CHARLES H WEIGLE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DERRICK A JOHNSON

Davisboro, GA 31018

Respondent

KARL FORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

CLINT C MALCOLM

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF LAW

40 Capitol Sq Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

PAULA K SMITH

Attorney at DEPARTMENT OF LAW 03

40 Capitol Square Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by DERRICK A JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2- Grounds for Claim and Motion to Withdraw Plea filed in Superior Court of Jones County, #2 Exhibit 3- Supreme Court Order, #3 Exhibit D- Consent to Search Authorization, #4 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 & 2- Grounds for Claim and Motion to Withdraw Plea filed in Superior C

1 #2

Exhibit 3- Supreme Court Order

1 #3

Exhibit D- Consent to Search Authorization

1 #4

Envelope

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DERRICK A JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit docket text(vs). Modified on 2/9/2022 to change event type(vs). (Entered: 01/26/2022)

2 #1

Envelope

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $5.00. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 02/09/2022 (vs) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DERRICK A JOHNSON, ORDER to Amend Complaint Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 02/25/2022. (vs) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of KARL FORT Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party KARL FORT(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CLINT C MALCOLM on behalf of KARL FORT Attorney CLINT C MALCOLM added to party KARL FORT(pty:res)(MALCOLM, CLINT) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#8

(#8) ***DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR***ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) Modified on 3/1/2022 to add docket text (tam). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DISREGARD ENTERED IN ERROR***ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) Modified on 3/1/2022 to add docket text (tam). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by KARL FORT ); The signature block does not include the e mail address of the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only. See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(vs) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by CLINT C MALCOLM on behalf of KARL FORT Attorney CLINT C MALCOLM added to party KARL FORT(pty:res)(MALCOLM, CLINT) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by PAULA K SMITH on behalf of KARL FORT Attorney PAULA K SMITH added to party KARL FORT(pty:res)(SMITH, PAULA) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DERRICK A JOHNSON, ORDER to Amend Complaint Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 02/25/2022. (vs) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFiling fee Paid: Habeas $5.00, Receipt Number GAM500042568. (vs) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is Ordered to pay an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $5.00. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES H WEIGLE on 02/09/2022 (vs) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (tam) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by DERRICK A JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tam) Modified on 1/27/2022 to edit docket text(vs). Modified on 2/9/2022 to change event type(vs). (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, filed by DERRICK A JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2- Grounds for Claim and Motion to Withdraw Plea filed in Superior Court of Jones County, #2 Exhibit 3- Supreme Court Order, #3 Exhibit D- Consent to Search Authorization, #4 Envelope)(tam) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paula K. Smith