This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/14/2022 at 06:02:38 (UTC).

Johnson v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 Johnson filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard D. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00033

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard D. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiara N. Johnson

Defendants

Facebook, Inc.

John Doe

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KOLAWOLE ONIFADE

Attorney at KOLAWOLE LAW FIRM LLC

7517 Cedar Grove Lane

Elkridge, MD 21075

Olufolajimi A Kolawole

Attorney at Kolawole Law Firm

7517 Cedar Grove Lane

Elkridge, MD 21075

Defendant Attorneys

Laura B Najemy

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

222 Berkeley St. Ste. 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Justine Brianna Deitz

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th St, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Caroline Simons

222 Berkeley Street Ste 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Lauren Christine Schnepper

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Caroline K Simons

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

222 Berkeley Street Ste 2000

Boston, MA 02116

 

Court Documents

36 #1

Exhibit 1

36 #36

Main Document

33 #3

Exhibit Exhibit K

33 #2

Exhibit Exhibit J

33 #1

Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Opposition Motion

33 #33

Main Document

32 #2

Text of Proposed Order

32 #1

Memorandum in Support

32 #32

Main Document

#6

(#6) Correspondence from Clerk re: Removal Notification Letter (c/m 01/07/2021 ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/7/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#4) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/7/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

#2

(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Andale, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Cassin Networks ApS (Denmark), Other Affiliate Facebook Holdings, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Facebook Ireland Holdings Unlimited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Facebook Ireland Limited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Facebook Operations, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Facebook Payments Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Facebook Technologies, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate FCL Tech Limited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Goldframe LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Greater Kudu LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Instagram, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate KUSU PTE. LTD (Singapore), Other Affiliate MALKOHA PTE LTD. (Singapore), Other Affiliate Morning Hornet LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Novi Financial, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Pinnacle Sweden AB (Sweden), Other Affiliate Raven Northbrook LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Runways Information Services Limited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Scout Development LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Siculus, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Sidecat LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Stadion LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Starbelt LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Vitesse, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate WhatsApp Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Winner LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Woolhawk LLC (Delaware) for Facebook, Inc..(Deitz, Justine) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B- State Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A- Jenny Pricer Declaration

#1

(#7) NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process)(Deitz, Justine) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed by Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Schnepper, Lauren) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE by Tiara N. Johnson re #33 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Kolawole, Olufolajimi) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) QC NOTICE: #33 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Tiara N. Johnson was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Order. To correct this problem, file Proposed Order using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Order to #33 . (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed by Tiara N. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff Opposition Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit Exhibit K)(Kolawole, Olufolajimi) (Entered: 03/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative to Transfer Venue by Meta Platforms, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnepper, Lauren) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER granting #30 Defendant's Motion to Recognize Change of Party Name. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/4/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Other Relief (To Recognize Change of Party Name) by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnepper, Lauren) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER granting #28 Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitute Counsel. Attorney Justine Brianna Deitz terminated. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/4/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Substitute Counsel by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schnepper, Lauren) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER granting #26 Facebook, Inc.'s Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #21 Amended Complaint; Facebook, Inc. answer due 3/10/2022. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/18/2022. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Facebook, Inc. by Tiara N. Johnson. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued 30 days as to Facebook, Inc. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COMPLAINT against John Doe, Facebook, Inc., filed by Tiara N. Johnson. (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Facebook, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process)(Deitz, Justine) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Correspondence from Clerk re: Removal Notification Letter (c/m 01/07/2021 ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) QC NOTICE: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Facebook, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **State Court documents should be individually attached and labeled to Notice of Removal. Please refile ONLY the state court documents using the event under Other Filings > Notices > Notice (Other) and link to #1 . (ols, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 1/7/2022. (kb3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Facebook, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Deitz, Justine) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Facebook, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Andale, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Cassin Networks ApS (Denmark), Other Affiliate Facebook Holdings, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Facebook Ireland Holdings Unlimited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Facebook Ireland Limited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Facebook Operations, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Facebook Payments Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Facebook Technologies, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate FCL Tech Limited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Goldframe LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Greater Kudu LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Instagram, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate KUSU PTE. LTD (Singapore), Other Affiliate MALKOHA PTE LTD. (Singapore), Other Affiliate Morning Hornet LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Novi Financial, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Pinnacle Sweden AB (Sweden), Other Affiliate Raven Northbrook LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Runways Information Services Limited (Ireland), Other Affiliate Scout Development LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Siculus, Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Sidecat LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Stadion LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Starbelt LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Vitesse, LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate WhatsApp Inc. (Delaware), Other Affiliate Winner LLC (Delaware), Other Affiliate Woolhawk LLC (Delaware) for Facebook, Inc..(Deitz, Justine) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Harford County, case number C-12-CV-21-000726. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9687379), filed by Facebook, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Jenny Pricer Declaration, #2 Exhibit B- State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Deitz, Justine) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura Najemy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline K. Simons