This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2022 at 08:57:23 (UTC).

Johnson v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-03700

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Johnson

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Troy A. Brenes

Attorney at Brenes Law Group, P.C.

Suite 330, 100 Spectrum Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorney

G. Brian Jackson

Attorney at Butler Snow, LLP -TN

Suite 1600, 150 3Rd Avenue South

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/20/21. (ddm) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#4

(#4) QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/22/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

#5

(#6) ORDER MODIFYING PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26: This Order applies to all Plaintiffs whose case is subject to the requirements of Practice and Procedure Order No. 26 entered May 13, 2021. (Doc. 743 in 1:17-md-02782-RWS). Except as modified herein, all requirements of PPO 26 remain in effect. For all cases subject to PPO 26 filed through the date of the entry of this Order, at the time of service of case-specific expert reports under Section II.D. of PPO 26, Plaintiffs shall also deliver a copy of the case-specific expert reports to Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel via electronic mail to MDL2782@bbga.com. For any expert report produced pursuant to PPO 26 prior to the entry of this Order Modifying Practice and Procedure Order 26, Plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14), days to deliver the previously served case-specific expert report to Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel via electronic mail to MDL2782@bbga.com. This Order shall not apply to new cases filed after the entry of this Order. Cases filed after the entry of this Order shall be subject to PPO 26 without any modification. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (docketed in 2021-2022 and division cases) (rsg) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

#6

(#7) SECOND QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (docketed in 2021-2022 and division cases)(rsg) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting 791 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Petition and Memorandum of Law Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/09/2022. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (docketed in 2021-2022 and division cases)(ddm) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting 791 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Petition and Memorandum of Law Under Seal. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 11/09/2022. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (docketed in 2021-2022 and division cases)(ddm) (Entered: 11/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SECOND QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (docketed in 2021-2022 and division cases)(rsg) (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER MODIFYING PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26: This Order applies to all Plaintiffs whose case is subject to the requirements of Practice and Procedure Order No. 26 entered May 13, 2021. (Doc. 743 in 1:17-md-02782-RWS). Except as modified herein, all requirements of PPO 26 remain in effect. For all cases subject to PPO 26 filed through the date of the entry of this Order, at the time of service of case-specific expert reports under Section II.D. of PPO 26, Plaintiffs shall also deliver a copy of the case-specific expert reports to Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel via electronic mail to MDL2782@bbga.com. For any expert report produced pursuant to PPO 26 prior to the entry of this Order Modifying Practice and Procedure Order 26, Plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14), days to deliver the previously served case-specific expert report to Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel via electronic mail to MDL2782@bbga.com. This Order shall not apply to new cases filed after the entry of this Order. Cases filed after the entry of this Order shall be subject to PPO 26 without any modification. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 09/26/2022. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al. (docketed in 2021-2022 and division cases) (rsg) (Entered: 09/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Brian Jackson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jackson, G.) (Entered: 09/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) QUALIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 06/22/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Re: Qualified Settlement Fund. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 9/20/21. (ddm) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER No. 26 Requirements for Record Preservation and Prima Facie Evidence of Implant, Injury and Causation. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 05/13/2021. (ddm) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand, filed by Karen Johnson. (Direct file MDL) (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12066212) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ddm) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer G. Brian Jackson