This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 07:53:07 (UTC).

Johnson v. EPA et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against EPA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian J. Davis and Monte C. Richardson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00510

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian J. Davis

Referral Judge

Monte C. Richardson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Clarence D. Johnson, Jr.

Chicago, IL 60657

Defendants

EPA

Canada

United States

Maersk

Amtrack

Bask

All DOT Federal & State

TSA GOV

Union Pacific

United States of America

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All DOT Federal & State, Amtrack, Bask, Canada, EPA, Maersk, TSA GOV, Union Pacific, United States filed by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Mailing Envelope) (No IFP, Fees not paid, No service copies)(JDR) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

1 #1

Attachment

1 #2

Mailing Envelope

#2

(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/5/2022. (BGR) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER ADOPTING #2 Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/26/2022. (BGR) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER ADOPTING #2 Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Brian J. Davis on 5/26/2022. (BGR) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia D. Barksdale on 4/5/2022. (BGR) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All DOT Federal & State, Amtrack, Bask, Canada, EPA, Maersk, TSA GOV, Union Pacific, United States filed by Clarence D. Johnson, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Mailing Envelope) (No IFP, Fees not paid, No service copies)(JDR) (Entered: 05/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EPA is a litigant

Latest cases where AMTRACK is a litigant

Latest cases where Canada, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MAERSK INC. is a litigant