This case was last updated from PACER on 01/26/2020 at 07:42:06 (UTC).

Johnson v. Emberton et al

Case Summary

On 11/27/2019 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Emberton. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerome T. Kearney and Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00848

  • Filing Date:

    11/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerome T. Kearney

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Everett Johnson

Clinton, AR 72031

Defendants

Tommy Mahan

Mike Shamoon

Lucas Emberton

Shaw

Crystal McMahan

Merriott

Love

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION to Correct Party in #2 Amended Complaint by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing Plaintiff Johnson, within 30 days from entry of this Order, to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with an Amended Complaint; and directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/09/2019. (ajt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#2

(#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE to the Court by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#7

(#7) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/19/2019. (lmc) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Defendants Shaw, Love, Meriott, and McMahan be dismissed, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and reccomendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/09/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form; granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct the name of a party; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Van Buren County Jail. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/19/2019. (ajt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Everett Johnson. (ljb) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants Lucas Emberton, Mike Shamoon, and Tommy Mahan; and directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #8 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/03/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE to the Court by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Defendants Shaw, Love, Meriott, and McMahan be dismissed, for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and reccomendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/09/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Summons Issued as to Lucas Emberton, Tommy Mahan, Mike Shamoon. And forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants Lucas Emberton, Mike Shamoon, and Tommy Mahan; and directing the United States Marshal to serve a copy of #8 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendants without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 01/03/2020. (ajt) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/19/2019. (lmc) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis; directing monthly payments be made from Plaintiff's institutional account for the $350 filing fee; directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 30 days from the date of this Order; directing the Clerk to mail Plaintiff the Court-provided 1983 Complaint form; granting #4 Plaintiff's Motion to Correct the name of a party; and directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order to the Van Buren County Jail. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/19/2019. (ajt) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Correct Party in #2 Amended Complaint by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing Plaintiff Johnson, within 30 days from entry of this Order, to submit either the $400 statutory filing fee or an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with an Amended Complaint; and directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff an In Forma Pauperis Motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/09/2019. (ajt) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Everett Johnson. (llg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Robert Everett Johnson. (ljb) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.