This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 07:12:48 (UTC).

Johnson v. Dell Financial Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Johnson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Dell Financial Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lauren King. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00257

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lauren King

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Johnson

Defendant

Dell Financial Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SaraEllen M Hutchison

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha K Pitsch

Justo Gonzalez

Manasi Praful Rodgers

Sinead Mary O'Carroll

 

Court Documents

#34

(#34) ORDER granting #33 Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal signed by Judge Lauren King. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, with each side to bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (NAW) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

33 #1

Proposed Order

#33

(#33) Stipulated MOTION and Order of Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/30/2023, (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

#32

(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Valentine & Kebartas LLC (a Massachusetts Limited Liability Company ), filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Equifax Information Services LLC (a Georgia Limited Liability Company), filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

29 #1

Proposed Order Dismissing Alltran Only

#29

(#29) Stipulated MOTION Dismissing Alltran Only, filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Alltran Only) Noting Date 3/15/2023, (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

27 #1

Proposed Order Dismissing Alltran Only

#27

(#27) Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Alltran Only, filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Alltran Only) Noting Date 3/31/2023 3/13/2023, (Hutchison, SaraEllen) Modified on 3/13/2023 per Dkt. No. 28. (NAW) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#6

(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (CR) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#5

(#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sinead Mary O'Carroll FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Dell Financial Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7902967 (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Manasi Praful Rodgers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Dell Financial Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7902957 (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dell Technologies Inc., Other Affiliate Denali Intermediate Inc., Other Affiliate Dell DFS Corporation, Other Affiliate Dell Inc., Other Affiliate Dell International LLC, Other Affiliate Dell DFS Group Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Dell DFS Holdings Kft, Other Affiliate Dell DFS Holdings LLC for Dell Financial Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Dell Financial Services LLC. (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Sinead O'Carroll re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Dell Financial Services LLC (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Complaint Complaint for Damages - Pages 9 - 25

1 #1

Summons Summons - Page 6 - 8

#1

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint, filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. Noting Date 3/1/2023, (Escobar, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER granting #33 Stipulated MOTION for Dismissal signed by Judge Lauren King. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, with each side to bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (NAW) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Stipulated MOTION and Order of Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/30/2023, (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Valentine & Kebartas LLC (a Massachusetts Limited Liability Company ), filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Equifax Information Services LLC (a Georgia Limited Liability Company), filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/21/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE ORDER (text only) GRANTING the parties' #29 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Alltran Financial, LP. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Alltran are DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with each side to bear their own fees and costs. Dkt. No. #27 is DENIED as moot. Authorized by Judge Lauren King. (NAW) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Stipulated MOTION Dismissing Alltran Only, filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Alltran Only) Noting Date 3/15/2023, (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/15/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNoting Date Reset: #27 Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Alltran Only is re-noted for 3/31/2023. (NAW) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE TO PARTIES: the Court re-notes Plaintiff and Alltran Financial, LP's #27 Joint Motion for 3/31/2023 pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(d) and Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and strikes "stipulated" from the caption. Because Docket Number #27 does not comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), as the "stipulation" is not "signed by all parties who have appeared," it is not self-effectuating. Nor is a motion "stipulated" when one party does not sign. Therefore, in accordance with Rule 41(a)(2), Plaintiff's claims against Alltran Financial, LP may be dismissed "at the plaintiff's request only by court order, on terms that the court considers proper." Alternatively, the parties may submit a stipulation "signed by all parties who have appeared" in compliance with Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). (NAW) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Stipulated MOTION to Dismiss Alltran Only, filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing Alltran Only) Noting Date 3/31/2023 3/13/2023, (Hutchison, SaraEllen) Modified on 3/13/2023 per Dkt. No. 28. (NAW) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to party(s) Trans Union LLC (a Delaware Limited Liability Company), filed by Plaintiff Nicole Johnson. (Hutchison, SaraEllen) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Complaint, filed by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. Noting Date 3/1/2023, (Escobar, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Escobar, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Andrew Ramiro Escobar on behalf of Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Escobar, Andrew) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file (CR) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketJudge Lauren King added. (CR) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sinead Mary O'Carroll FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Dell Financial Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7902967 (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Manasi Praful Rodgers FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Dell Financial Services LLC (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7902957 (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dell Technologies Inc., Other Affiliate Denali Intermediate Inc., Other Affiliate Dell DFS Corporation, Other Affiliate Dell Inc., Other Affiliate Dell International LLC, Other Affiliate Dell DFS Group Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Dell DFS Holdings Kft, Other Affiliate Dell DFS Holdings LLC for Dell Financial Services LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Dell Financial Services LLC. (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Sinead O'Carroll re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Dell Financial Services LLC (Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with State Court JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff indicated in Complaint; from King County Superior Court, case number CASE NUMBER NOT ASSIGNED; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7902805) Attorney Justo Gonzalez added to party Dell Financial Services LLC(pty:dft), filed by Dell Financial Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons - Page 6 - 8, #2 Complaint Complaint for Damages - Pages 9 - 25, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gonzalez, Justo) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less