This case was last updated from PACER on 03/14/2021 at 09:09:38 (UTC).

Johnson v. Davinci Roofscapes, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2021 Johnson filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05010

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harold Johnson

Defendants

Nationwide General Insurance Company

Davinci Roofscapes, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Seth A. White

Attorney at Keith Law Group

5050 W. Northgate Rd, Ste. 108, Rogers

Rogers, AR 72756

Defendant Attorneys

James D. Burns

Attorney at Laser Law Firm P.A.

101 S. Spring Street, Suite 300

Little Rock, AR 72201

Jeremy K. Ward

Attorney at Franden Woodard Farris Qillin Goodnight

2 W. 2Nd Street, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Jill Walker-Abdoveis

Attorney at Franden Farris Quillin Goodnight & Roberts

2 W 2Nd Street, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Burns, James) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Ward, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404(a) by Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Walker-Abdoveis, Jill) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 3/8/2021 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 15, 2021. (slc) Modified to correct date on 1/19/2021 (slc). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Walker-Abdoveis on behalf of Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Walker-Abdoveis, Jill) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER filed in State Court to #4 Complaint by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#4

(#4) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Davinci Roofscapes, LLC, Nationwide General Insurance Company, filed by Harold Johnson.(tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

1 #3

Notice of Notice of Removal

1 #2

State Court Answer

1 #1

State Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-20-2634., filed by DaVinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Answer, #3 Notice of Notice of Removal)(tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing reset for 3/30/2021 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 26, 2021. (slc) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Nationwide General Insurance Company. (Burns, James) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Ward, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404(a) filed by Harold Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nationwide Engineer Report)(White, Seth) (Entered: 02/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2317214.. (Ward, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/25/2021 (tg) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404(a) by Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 DaVincis Limited Lifetime Material Warranty)(Walker-Abdoveis, Jill) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss TO DISMISS FOR FORUM NON CONVENIENS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404(a) by Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Walker-Abdoveis, Jill) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 3/8/2021 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/23/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 15, 2021. (slc) Modified to correct date on 1/19/2021 (slc). (Entered: 01/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Walker-Abdoveis on behalf of Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Walker-Abdoveis, Jill) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Jill Walker-Abdoveis. (tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER filed in State Court to #4 Complaint by Nationwide General Insurance Company.(tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Davinci Roofscapes, LLC, Nationwide General Insurance Company, filed by Harold Johnson.(tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Davinci Roofscapes, LLC. (tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-20-2634., filed by DaVinci Roofscapes, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Answer, #3 Notice of Notice of Removal)(tg) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Davinci Roofscapes, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James D. Burns

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeremy K. Ward