This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:07:36 (UTC).

Johnson v. Cook County Jail et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Johnson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Cook County Jail. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07585

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charles L. Johnson

Defendants

Lt Barajas

Cook County Jail

R/O Salefski

Cook County Medical Staff

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Charles L. Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit) (sxb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) LETTER from Charles Johnson dated 12/25/19. (Envelope postmark 12/31/19) (Case number not displayed on document). (smm, ) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Charles L. Johnson for attorney representation (sxb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is taken under advisement. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, he must (1) explain in writing and under oath in a written statement entitled an "IFP Statement" why he should be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) submit a certified trust fund statement showing activity in his account from November 7, 2019, to the date he responds to this order. If Plaintiff was incarcerated at more than one facility between April 29, 2019 and the date of his response, he must provide a certified trust fund account statement from each facility at which he was incarcerated in that time. Alternatively, he may pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee; payment may be made by check or money order payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Failure to comply with this order by January 17, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also is advised that he must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. The Court defers consideration of Plaintiff's complaint and motion for attorney representation until his fee status has been resolved. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/9/2019. Mailed notice (nsf,) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Charles L. Johnson for extension of time (Envelope postmark illegible) (Document does not display case number) (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#2

(#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

1 #1

Envelope not postmarked

#1

(#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Charles L. Johnson (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked)(sxb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER from Charles Johnson dated 12/25/19. (Envelope postmark 12/31/19) (Case number not displayed on document). (smm, ) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION by Plaintiff Charles L. Johnson for extension of time (Envelope postmark illegible) (Document does not display case number) (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is taken under advisement. If Plaintiff wants to proceed with this action, he must (1) explain in writing and under oath in a written statement entitled an "IFP Statement" why he should be allowed to proceed in forma pauperis and (2) submit a certified trust fund statement showing activity in his account from November 7, 2019, to the date he responds to this order. If Plaintiff was incarcerated at more than one facility between April 29, 2019 and the date of his response, he must provide a certified trust fund account statement from each facility at which he was incarcerated in that time. Alternatively, he may pay the Court's $400.00 filing fee; payment may be made by check or money order payable to Clerk, United States District Court. Failure to comply with this order by January 17, 2020, will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff also is advised that he must promptly submit a change-of-address notification if he is transferred to another facility or released. If Plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, this action will be subject to dismissal for failure to comply with a Court order and for failure to prosecute. The Court defers consideration of Plaintiff's complaint and motion for attorney representation until his fee status has been resolved. Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr on 12/9/2019. Mailed notice (nsf,) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Charles L. Johnson for attorney representation (sxb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION by Plaintiff Charles L. Johnson for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibit) (sxb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (sxb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Charles L. Johnson (Exhibits) (Attachments: #1 Envelope not postmarked)(sxb, ) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.