This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/06/2020 at 09:10:02 (UTC).

Johnson v. Conifer Health Solutions

Case Summary

On 10/07/2020 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Conifer Health Solutions. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine A. Nowak and Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00767

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine A. Nowak

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yetta Johnson

Dallas, TX 75287

Defendant

Conifer Health Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Gavin Samuel Martinson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC - Dallas

8117 Preston Road, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75225

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Conifer Health Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Yetta Johnson as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Conifer Health Solutions, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/16/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

8 #1

Magistrate referral

#8

(#8) Case reassigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03046. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#6

(#6) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 10/6/2020) (mcrd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yetta Johnson. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Yetta Johnson. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Conifer Health Solutions filed by Yetta Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Conifer Health Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martinson, Gavin) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Yetta Johnson as to #9 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Issued as to Conifer Health Solutions, forwarded to USM for service. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 10/16/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to Plf. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Case reassigned to District Judge Sean D. Jordan and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-03046. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:6. Tue Oct 6 13:53:32 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Transferring to Another District: Case transferred to Sherman Division of Eastern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 10/6/2020) (mcrd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:1, 2. Mon Oct 5 15:16:17 CDT 2020 (crt) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Yetta Johnson. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Yetta Johnson. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Conifer Health Solutions filed by Yetta Johnson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Ramirez (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/7/2020.] (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conifer Health Solutions, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gavin S Martinson