This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:44:32 (UTC).

Johnson v. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Johnson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald C Coggins, Jr and Kaymani D West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00047

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald C Coggins, Jr

Referral Judge

Kaymani D West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Phillip Randal Johnson

Defendant

Commissioner of the Social Security Administration

Interested Party

Social Security Administrative Record

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clifford F Gaddy, Jr

Attorney at Cliff Gaddy Law Firm

408 N Church Street

Greenville, SC 29601

 

Court Documents

#3

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phillip Randal Johnson. Commissioner of the Social Security Administration served on 1/16/2020, pursuant to Local Rule 83.VII.03 answer due 5/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(Gaddy, Clifford) (Main Document replaced on 2/27/2020 with corrected document provided by filing user). (gnan ). (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/17/2020.(gnan ) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Additional Attachments to Main Document #3 Motion to Leave In Forma Pauperis re: 6 Order. (Gaddy, Clifford) Modified on 1/17/2020 to link document to correct events. (gnan, ). (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • Docket(#6) ORDER: Plaintiff is ordered to complete Form AO 239, Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees of Costs (Long Form) and note the instructions stating: "Use gross amounts, that is, amounts before any deductions for taxes or otherwise." Plaintiff's attorney can find this form at https://www.uscourts.gov/forms/fee-waiver-application-forms/application-proceed-district-court-without-prepaying-fees-or. Plaintiff is Ordered to complete the form within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 1/8/2020. (gnan, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of the Social Security Administration. U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Service due by 4/6/2020. (gnan ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Phillip Randal Johnson. Response to Motion due by 1/21/2020. No proposed order. Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(gnan ) See additional attachment at #8 . (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of the Social Security Administration Clerk's Note: See 28:636(b)(1)(C)(4)(c)(1) and Local Rule 83.VII.02 regarding Consents to Proceed before Magistrate Judge in Social Security cases. Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge forms are available on the Court's website, filed by Phillip Randal Johnson. Service due by 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Fee Agreement, #2 Affidavit).(gnan ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less