This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 07:46:48 (UTC).

Johnson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Johnson filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy S. Black and Stephanie K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01049

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Timothy S. Black

Stephanie K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Keith Johnson

Defendants

Commissioner of Social Security

Social Secuirty Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Rake

Attorney at Horenstein, Nicholson & Blumenthal - 3

124 East Third Street, 5Th Floor

Dayton, OH 45402

Defendant Attorneys

Adam R. Sorkin

Attorney at Social Security Administration, Office of General Counsel

200 W Adams Street, 30Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

John J. Stark

Attorney at US Attorney Office

303 Marconi Boulevard, Suite 200

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/3/2020. (km) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#5

(#5) JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Sorkin, Adam) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Rake, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (eh) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

1 #7

Summons Form

1 #6

Summons Form

1 #5

Summons Form

1 #4

Summons Form

1 #3

Exhibit Time Entries

1 #2

Exhibit Notice of Award

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt #0648-7237768 against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Keith Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Award, #3 Exhibit Time Entries, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 1/3/2020. (km) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT CONSENT OF THE PARTIES TO PROCEED BEFORE THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE . (Sorkin, Adam) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/16/2019, answer due 2/14/2020. (Rake, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (eh) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number Receipt #0648-723776 (eh) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt #0648-7237768 against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Keith Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Notice of Award, #3 Exhibit Time Entries, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form) (Rake, Michael) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.