This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/09/2021 at 10:36:00 (UTC).

Johnson v. ChildCareGroup

Case Summary

On 02/08/2021 Johnson filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against ChildCareGroup. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam R Cummings. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00282

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam R Cummings

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brittney Johnson

Defendant

ChildCareGroup

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

W D Masterson, III

Attorney at Kilgore & Kilgore PLLC

3109 Carlisle, Suite 200

Dallas, TX 75204

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brittney Johnson. Waiver sent on 2/27/2021. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ChildCareGroup; served on 2/26/2021. (mjr) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ChildCareGroup. (mjr) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brittney Johnson. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

1 #1

Cover Sheet Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ChildCareGroup filed by Brittney Johnson. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11588821) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Masterson, W) (Attachment 1 replaced/flattened on 2/8/2021) (mjr). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brittney Johnson. Waiver sent on 2/27/2021. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to ChildCareGroup; served on 2/26/2021. (mjr) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ChildCareGroup. (mjr) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mjr) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brittney Johnson. (Masterson, W) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against ChildCareGroup filed by Brittney Johnson. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-11588821) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Cover Sheet) (Masterson, W) (Attachment 1 replaced/flattened on 2/8/2021) (mjr). (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer W D Masterson, III