This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:46:31 (UTC).

Johnson v. Capital One Financial Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Johnson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Capital One Financial Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00453

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Harry C Johnson

Yukon, OK 73099

Defendant

Capital One Financial Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael A Furlong

Attorney at Hartzog Conger Cason LLP

201 Robert S Kerr Ave, Suite 1600

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Kaylee P Davis-Maddy

Attorney at Doerner Saunders Daniel & Anderson-OKC

105 N Hudson, Suite 500

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-4805

Leslie P Fisher

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP - DALLAS

1445 Ross Ave, Suite 3700

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand by Harry C Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ramos v. Wells Fargo Bank)(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Harry C Johnson. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

6 #1

Exhibit Ramos v. Wells Fargo Bank

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Fisher, Leslie) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#9

(#9) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 Response to Motion by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of #4 its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff'sComplaint. The deadline for Defendant to reply is extended through and including July 5, 2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/20/2019. (ks) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

7 #1

Exhibit Ramos v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harry C Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ramos v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA)(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#8

(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Leslie P Fisher on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation (Fisher, Leslie) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Furlong on behalf of Harry C Johnson (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Capital One Financial Corporation . (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - Docket Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal - Petition

1 #3

Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal - Summons

1 #4

Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal - EOA Johnson

1 #5

Exhibit 5 to Notice of Removal - EOA Capital One

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Harry C Johnson. (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Fisher, Leslie) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Reply in Support of #4 its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff'sComplaint. The deadline for Defendant to reply is extended through and including July 5, 2019. Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 6/20/2019. (ks) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss , #7 Response to Motion by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Leslie P Fisher on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation (Fisher, Leslie) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Harry C Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ramos v. Wells Fargo Bank, NA)(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Remand by Harry C Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ramos v. Wells Fargo Bank)(Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Furlong on behalf of Harry C Johnson (Furlong, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Capital One Financial Corporation . (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Kaylee P Davis-Maddy on behalf of Capital One Financial Corporation (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2924697. (Davis-Maddy, Kaylee) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Canadian County, case number CJ-2019-211 filed by Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal - Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal - Summons, #4 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal - EOA Johnson, #5 Exhibit 5 to Notice of Removal - EOA Capital One, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmt) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.