Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/12/2020 at 08:43:03 (UTC).

Johnson v. Buffalo Police Department et al

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Buffalo Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is John L. Sinatra, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00304

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert W. Johnson

Bronx, NY 10469

Defendants

Daniel S. Johnston

Family Court of State of New York

Kevin M. Carter

John Doe

Carol A. Cherry

Lisa Bloch Rodwin

State of New York

Mary Giallanza Carney

Margaret O. Szczur

Alternative Home Services

Kelly Buckley

Erie County Youth Services Center

Sharon M. LoVallo

Paul W. Wolf

L. Alford

County of Erie

Lisa A. Virgilio

Deanne M. Tripi

County of Erie and Docket No. D-32278-98

3 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

4 #1

*Restricted*

#4

(#4) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01549. (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#3

(#3) TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/6/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against L. Alford, Alternative Home Services, Frank J. Boccio, Kelly Buckley, Buffalo Police Department, Mary Giallanza Carney, Kevin M. Carter, Carol A. Cherry, County of Erie, County of Erie and Docket No. D-32278-98, John Doe, Erie County Youth Services Center, Family Court of the State of New York, Brenda M. Freedman, Daniel S. Johnston, Sharon M. Lovallo, Lisa Bloch Rodwin, State of New York, Margaret O. Szczur, Deanne M. Tripi, Lisa A. Virgilio, Paul W. Wolf. Document filed by Robert W. Johnson. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

#1

(#1) AFFIDAVIT OR DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert W. Johnson. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPro Se Packet Mailed to Plaintiff which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, ADR documents. (SG) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:20-cv-01549. (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMailed a copy of #3 Order, to Robert W. Johnson 3345 Fish Ave. Apt. 1 Bronx, NY 10469. (aea) [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Western District of New York. (rjm) [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRANSFER ORDER. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of New York. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/6/2020) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against L. Alford, Alternative Home Services, Frank J. Boccio, Kelly Buckley, Buffalo Police Department, Mary Giallanza Carney, Kevin M. Carter, Carol A. Cherry, County of Erie, County of Erie and Docket No. D-32278-98, John Doe, Erie County Youth Services Center, Family Court of the State of New York, Brenda M. Freedman, Daniel S. Johnston, Sharon M. Lovallo, Lisa Bloch Rodwin, State of New York, Margaret O. Szczur, Deanne M. Tripi, Lisa A. Virgilio, Paul W. Wolf. Document filed by Robert W. Johnson. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) AFFIDAVIT OR DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Robert W. Johnson. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 3/13/2020.] (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less