Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/09/2019 at 07:57:55 (UTC).

Johnson v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/10/2019 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BP Exploration Production, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are P. Bradley Murray, William E. Cassady and Terry F. Moorer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00765

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Southern District

Judge Details

Judges

P. Bradley Murray

William E. Cassady

Terry F. Moorer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virgil Jerome Johnson

Defendants

BP Exploration & Production Inc

BP America Production Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Howard L. Nations

Attorney at The Nations Law Firm

3131 Briarpark Dr., Suite 208

Houston, TX 77042

Defendant Attorneys

Harlan I. Prater, IV

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

William H. Morrow

Attorney at Lightfoot, Franklin & White

400 North 20Th Street

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Discovery filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Morrow, William) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Morrow, William) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09627. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/8/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#6

(#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than September 4, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than October 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/5/2019.(clw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 08/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 05/22/2019)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7591889) filed by Virgil Jerome Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Virgil Jerome Johnson(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/22/2019)

#9

(#10) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

8 #3

Authorization

8 #2

HIPAA Protective Order

8 #1

Protective Order

#8

(#9) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Notice of Filing Notice of Service of Discovery filed by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc. (Morrow, William) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • (#13) ORDER in case 1:18-cv-00533-CG-MU-C; granting (23) Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Clinton Ray South terminated in case 1:19-cv-00102-JB-MU-C. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 11-20-19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00102-JB-MU-C et al. (lly) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Morrow on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Morrow, William) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Harlan I. Prater, IV on behalf of BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production Inc (Prater, Harlan) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Omnibus Order Modifying BELO Case Management Order re: (1 in 1:19-cv-05000-KD-MU-C). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 9/4/2019. (skb) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BELO Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 05/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Protective Order, # 2 HIPAA Protective Order, # 3 Authorization) (skb) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09627. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDERED that the instant matter is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Alabama. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 10/8/2019. (NEF: Sect J)(caa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. Regarding Venue (Reid, Devin) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED THAT, no later than September 4, 2019, plaintiffs in the attached lists must provide full and complete initial disclosures. Failure to provide the disclosures by the above date will result in an order that plaintiffs and their counsel must appear in person before Judge Barbier to show cause why their cases should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.37(b)(2)(A)(v). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, as to all of the listed cases in which plaintiffs produce full and complete disclosures in compliance with this order, the deadline by which the parties must submit their venue filing is extended to no later than October 4, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 8/5/2019.(clw) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc..Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP America Production Company(pty:dft), Attorney Don Keller Haycraft added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:dft).(Haycraft, Don) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INITIAL PROCEEDINGS CASE MANAGEMENT ORDERS No.'s 1 and 2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 1/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 BELO Settlement Agreement)(as) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (ess) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against BP America Production Company, BP Exploration & Production, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7591889) filed by Virgil Jerome Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Howard L. Nations added to party Virgil Jerome Johnson(pty:pla).(Nations, Howard) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 10/10/2019.] (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BP EXPLORATION & PRODUCTION, INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Howard L. Nations - PHV