This case was last updated from PACER on 10/29/2021 at 08:17:37 (UTC).

Johnson v. BJ's Restaurants, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2021 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against BJ's Restaurants, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Lucy H. Koh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-06676

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Lucy H. Koh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Johnson

Defendant

BJ's Restaurants, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Prathima Reddy Price

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Michael Chilleen

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP

650 Town Center Drive, 10Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-1993

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Interested Entities by BJ's Restaurants, Inc. (Chilleen, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byBJ's Restaurants, Inc.. (Chilleen, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2021) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. BJ's Restaurants, Inc. served on 9/13/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Kohfor all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 9/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2021) (Entered: 09/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2021) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/31/2021) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to BJ's Restaurants, Inc. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/13/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re #1 Complaint (Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16333689.). Filed byScott Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seabock, Amanda) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BJ'S RESTAURANTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael J Chilleen