This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2021 at 07:59:46 (UTC).

Johnson v. Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00676

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Johnson

Defendant

Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen Bishop

Attorney at Brown and Crouppen

2345 Grand Blvd., Ste 675

Kansas City, MO 64108

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Patrick Johnson

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-KCMO

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

Kerri S Reisdorff

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart-KCMO

4520 Main Street, Suite 400

Kansas City, MO 64111

 

Court Documents

16 #1

Exhibit A

16 #16

Main Document

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2022. Teleconference set for 9/29/2022, 2:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 11/10/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Exchange R26 Disclosures) by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#13

(#13) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Michael Johnson. (Bishop, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #9 Amended Complaint, (Unopposed) filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

9 #3

Exhibit C - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue

9 #2

Exhibit B - MCHR Notice of Right to Sue Letter

9 #1

Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit A-First Amended Complaint

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/9/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 10/26/2021. Signed on 9/22/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#6

5 #1

MAP General Order

5 #5

Main Document

#2

1 #2

Exhibit B - Rios Declaration

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 motion for leave to file. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint within seven days. Signed on November 18, 2021 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Accardi, Max) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Stephen Bishop on behalf of Michael Johnson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/1/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bishop, Stephen) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/1/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2022. Teleconference set for 9/29/2022, 2:00 PM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 11/10/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION (Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time to Exchange R26 Disclosures) by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.. (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Michael Johnson. (Bishop, Stephen) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #11 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #9 Amended Complaint, (Unopposed) Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. Defendant's answer due 11/17/2021. Signed on October 15, 2021 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Accardi, Max) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #9 Amended Complaint, (Unopposed) filed by Daniel Patrick Johnson on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Johnson, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. In light of Plaintiff filing the Amended Complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B), (Doc. 9), Defendant's motion to dismiss the original pleading is denied without prejudice as moot. Signed on October 5, 2021 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Accardi, Max) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. filed by Stephen Bishop on behalf of Michael Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - MCHR Notice of Right to Sue Letter, #3 Exhibit C - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue)(Bishop, Stephen) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Stephen Bishop on behalf of Plaintiff Michael Johnson. Reply suggestions due by 10/18/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-First Amended Complaint)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Bishop, Stephen) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/9/2021. Rule 26 conference due by 10/26/2021. Signed on 9/22/21 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Kerri S Reisdorff on behalf of Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc..(Reisdorff, Kerri) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of filing of Notice of Removal with State Court by Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Reisdorff, Kerri) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUGGESTIONS in support re #2 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kerri S Reisdorff on behalf of Defendant Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.. (Related document(s) #2 ) (Reisdorff, Kerri) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kerri S Reisdorff on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/4/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Reisdorff, Kerri) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, case number 2116-CV17590, filed by Kerri S Reisdorff. Filing fee $402, receipt number BMOWDC-7591605. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Rios Declaration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reisdorff, Kerri) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel P Johnson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kerri S. Reisdorff