This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:18:06 (UTC).

Johnson v. Aston Carter, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Johnson filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Aston Carter, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernard A. Friedman and Curtis Ivy, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10025

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Bernard A. Friedman

Referral Judge

Curtis Ivy, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ronald Johnson

Defendants

Aston Carter, Inc.

Aerotek, Inc.

Allegis Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jack W. Schulz

Attorney at Schulz Gotham PLC

Po Box 44855

Detroit, MI 48244

Defendant Attorney

Andrew L. Scroggins

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Suite 8000, 233 South Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ronald Johnson against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8744281 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Aerotek, Inc., Allegis Group, Inc., Aston Carter, Inc.* (SSch) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Aston Carter, Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Aerotek, Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Allegis Group, Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Scroggins on behalf of All Defendants. (Scroggins, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by All Defendants (Scroggins, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

#8

(#8) STIPULATED ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE HIS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" AMENDED COMPLAINT) (JCur) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit "A" AMENDED COMPLAINT

#9

(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Ronald Johnson against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Right to Sue Letter)) (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

9 #1

Exhibit A (Right to Sue Letter)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2021-08-27 EEOC Charge) (Scroggins, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

10 #1

Exhibit 2021-08-27 EEOC Charge

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2021-08-27 EEOC Charge) (Scroggins, Andrew) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Ronald Johnson against All Defendants. NO NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Right to Sue Letter)) (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATED ORDER TO ALLOW PLAINTIFF TO FILE HIS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" AMENDED COMPLAINT) (JCur) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by All Defendants (Scroggins, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L. Scroggins on behalf of All Defendants. (Scroggins, Andrew) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Allegis Group, Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Aerotek, Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Aston Carter, Inc. served on 1/10/2022, answer due 1/31/2022. (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (SSch) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Aerotek, Inc., Allegis Group, Inc., Aston Carter, Inc.* (SSch) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Ronald Johnson against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8744281 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Schulz, Jack) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allegis Group Company doing business as Aerotek Staffing Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where AEROTEK INC. A MARYLAND CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Lylburn Scroggins