This case was last updated from PACER on 05/01/2021 at 11:11:12 (UTC).

Johnson Funeral Home L L C v. Federated Mutual Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 Johnson Funeral Home L L C filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Federated Mutual Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00539

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnson Funeral Home, LLC

Johnson Funeral Home L L C

Defendant

Federated Mutual Insurance Co

Special Masters

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Russell J Stutes, Jr

Attorney at Stutes & Lavergne

P O Box 1644

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Russell Joseph Stutes

Attorney at Stutes & Lavergne

P O Box 1644

Lake Charles, LA 70602

Defendant Attorneys

Karl Andrew Schulz

Attorney at Cozen & O'Connor (HOU)

1221 Mckinney St Ste 2900

Houston, TX 77010-2009

David R Frohn

Attorney at MG+M Law Firm (LC)

3729 Cobblestone Dr

Lake Charles, LA 70605-2570

Kendall Kelly Hayden

Attorney at Cozen & O'Connor (DAL)

1717 Main St Ste 3400

Dallas, TX 75201

Special Master Attorneys

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Karl A Schulz for Federated Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/23/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kendall Kelly Hayden for Federated Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/16/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

10 #2

Certificate of good standing

10 #1

Proposed order

#10

(#10) Ex Parte MOTION for Kendall Kelly Hayden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4641469) by Federated Mutual Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Frohn, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

9 #2

Certificate of good standing

9 #1

Proposed order

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federated Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Frohn, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Federated Mutual Insurance Co. through Louisiana Secretary of State on 3-8-2021, filed by Johnson Funeral Home L L C. (aty,Stutes, Russell) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federated Mutual Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

4 #2

Exhibit B

4 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson Funeral Home L L C. (aty,Stutes, Russell) Modified docket text on 3/3/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Johnson Funeral Home L L C. (aty,Stutes, Russell) Modified docket text on 3/3/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Federated Mutual Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4592943) filed by Johnson Funeral Home L L C.(Attorney Russell J Stutes, Jr added to party Johnson Funeral Home L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Stutes, Russell) Modified docket text on 3/3/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Karl A Schulz for Federated Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/23/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Kendall Kelly Hayden for Federated Mutual Insurance Co. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 4/16/2021. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Ex Parte MOTION for Kendall Kelly Hayden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4641469) by Federated Mutual Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Frohn, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Ex Parte MOTION for Karl A. Schulz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4641447) by Federated Mutual Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 4/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of good standing)(aty,Frohn, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federated Mutual Insurance Co. (aty,Frohn, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Federated Mutual Insurance Co.(Attorney David R Frohn added to party Federated Mutual Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Frohn, David) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Johnson Funeral Home L L C. Federated Mutual Insurance Co served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY as this was filed in error as an Affidavit of Service. (crt,Bunting, M) Modified to add document number on 3/9/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Federated Mutual Insurance Co. through Louisiana Secretary of State on 3-8-2021, filed by Johnson Funeral Home L L C. (aty,Stutes, Russell) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federated Mutual Insurance Co. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Johnson Funeral Home L L C. (aty,Stutes, Russell) Modified docket text on 3/3/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Johnson Funeral Home L L C. (aty,Stutes, Russell) Modified docket text on 3/3/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketJudge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay added. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Federated Mutual Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4592943) filed by Johnson Funeral Home L L C.(Attorney Russell J Stutes, Jr added to party Johnson Funeral Home L L C(pty:pla))(aty,Stutes, Russell) Modified docket text on 3/3/2021 (Bunting, M). (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERATED MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cade Richard Cole