This case was last updated from PACER on 05/22/2020 at 07:49:31 (UTC).

Johnson et al v. Zynga Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2020 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Zynga Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02024

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carol Johnson

Lisa Thomas

Defendant

Zynga Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hassan Ali Zavareei

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei LLP

1828 L Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Mark Andrew Clifford

Attorney at Tycko and Zavareei, LLP

1828 L St Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Melissa S. Weiner

Attorney at PEARSON SIMON & WARSHAW, LLP

800 Lasalle Avenue, Suite 2150

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Sabita J. Soneji

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei LLP

1970 Broadway Suite 1070

Oakland, CA 94612

Joseph C Bourne

Attorney at Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP

800 Lasalle Ave, Suite 2150

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Daniel L. Warshaw

Attorney at Pearson, Simon & Warshaw, LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth L. Deeley

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111-6538

Susan E. Engel

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Serrin A Turner

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

885 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

27 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#27

(#27) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Susan E. Engel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14474987.) filed by Zynga Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Engel, Susan) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

26 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#26

(#26) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Serrin Turner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14474962.) filed by Zynga Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Turner, Serrin) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

#25

(#25) Case Reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

#24

(#24) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#23

(#23) Case Reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#22

(#22) RELATED CASE ORDER. 20-cv-2024, Johnson, et al., v. Zynga, Inc., is related to 20-1539, I.C., et al., v. Zynga, Inc. The Clerk of Court is instructed to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#12

(#21) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa S. Weiner. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carol Johnson, Lisa Thomas.. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Carol Johnson, Lisa Thomas. Service waived by Zynga Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Warshaw (Amended) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Warshaw (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C Bourne (Bourne, Joseph) (Filed on 3/27/2020) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 3/23/2020) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Zynga Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14306198.). Filed byCarol Johnson, Lisa Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 3/23/2020) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Susan E. Engel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14474987.) filed by Zynga Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Engel, Susan) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Serrin Turner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14474962.) filed by Zynga Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Turner, Serrin) (Filed on 5/15/2020) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Case Reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2020) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 29, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Case Reassigned to Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2020) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RELATED CASE ORDER. 20-cv-2024, Johnson, et al., v. Zynga, Inc., is related to 20-1539, I.C., et al., v. Zynga, Inc. The Clerk of Court is instructed to reassign the later-filed action to the undersigned. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 28, 2020. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2020) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Melissa S. Weiner. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Clifford. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER re SUA SPONTE REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP as to cases 4:20-2024-YGR and 3:20-1539-MMC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/21/2020. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2020) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 04/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2020) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Sabita J. Soneji (Soneji, Sabita) (Filed on 4/8/2020) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Carol Johnson, Lisa Thomas.. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 4/6/2020) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Carol Johnson, Lisa Thomas. Service waived by Zynga Inc. waiver sent on 3/25/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 4/2/2020) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Warshaw (Amended) (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Warshaw (Warshaw, Daniel) (Filed on 4/1/2020) (Entered: 04/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C Bourne (Bourne, Joseph) (Filed on 3/27/2020) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2020 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/6/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2020) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 3/23/2020) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Zynga Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14306198.). Filed byCarol Johnson, Lisa Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zavareei, Hassan) (Filed on 3/23/2020) (Entered: 03/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zynga Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sabita J Soneji

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark Andrew Clifford

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa S. Weiner