This case was last updated from PACER on 12/14/2020 at 08:45:52 (UTC).

JOHNSON v. ZOLL MEDICAL CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 JOHNSON filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against ZOLL MEDICAL CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is TILMAN E SELF, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00402

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TILMAN E SELF, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carol Johnson

Carol Johnson, as administrator of the Estate and Surviving Spouse of Edward Johnson

Defendants

H&CS Services, LLC d/b/a Community Ambulance

John and Janes Does

Zoll Medical Corporation

JOHN AND OR JANE DOES 1-10

H&CS SERVICES LLC doing business as COMMUNITY AMBULANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRANKLIN GADDY

2245 Vinevile Ave

Macon, GA 31204

Kevin Bernard Hicks

5962 Zebulon Rd Ste 229

Macon, GA 31220

Defendant Attorneys

EDGAR A NEELY, IV

191 Peachtree St Ne Ste 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

Thomas J. Mazziotti

191 Peachtree St Ne, Ste 2900

Atlanta, GA 30303-1775

MAX MATTHEW WALLACE II

999 Peachtree St Ne Ste 950

Atlanta, GA 30309

Brian K Mathis

181 14Th St Ste 200

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) JUDGMENT (vs) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER terminating #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting #12 Motion to Remand case to State Court of Bibb County. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/7/2020. (chc) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response filed by CAROL JOHNSON re #12 MOTION to Remand Re-Filed, #9 MOTION to Remand (GADDY, FRANKLIN) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

#13

(#13) RESPONSE filed by ZOLL MEDICAL CORPORATION re #12 MOTION to Remand Re-Filed (Mazziotti, Thomas) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

12 #1

Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Remand

#12

(#12) MOTION to Remand Re-Filed by CAROL JOHNSON filed by FRANKLIN GADDY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(GADDY, FRANKLIN) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Stay Deadline to Answer Defendant Zoll Medical Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by CAROL JOHNSON filed by FRANKLIN GADDY.(GADDY, FRANKLIN) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

9 #1

Memorandum in Support

#9

(#9) ***Re-filed at #12 *** MOTION to Remand by CAROL JOHNSON filed by FRANKLIN GADDY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(GADDY, FRANKLIN) Modified on 11/3/2020 to add docket(vs). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - PMA Supplement Listing

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - PMA Approval Order

2 #1

Memorandum in Support

#2

(#15) ORDER terminating #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting #12 Motion to Remand case to State Court of Bibb County. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/7/2020. (chc) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Def ZOLL Mass Business Entity Summary

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings

#1

Notice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ZOLL MEDICAL CORPORATION ); Notice to Counsel - THOMAS J. MAZZIOTTI Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(vs) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) JUDGMENT (vs) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER terminating #2 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; and granting #12 Motion to Remand case to State Court of Bibb County. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 12/7/2020. (chc) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response filed by CAROL JOHNSON re #12 MOTION to Remand Re-Filed, #9 MOTION to Remand (GADDY, FRANKLIN) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE filed by ZOLL MEDICAL CORPORATION re #12 MOTION to Remand Re-Filed (Mazziotti, Thomas) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Remand Re-Filed by CAROL JOHNSON filed by FRANKLIN GADDY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Brief in Support of Motion to Remand)(GADDY, FRANKLIN) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #9 Motion to Remand filed by CAROL JOHNSON ); The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. All electronically filed documents must include a signature block and must set forth the filers name, address, telephone number and e-mail address. The name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block.(vs) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #10 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff shall have 14 days after the Court rules on her Motion to Remand, if necessary, to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/30/2020 (TES) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Stay Deadline to Answer Defendant Zoll Medical Corporation's Motion to Dismiss by CAROL JOHNSON filed by FRANKLIN GADDY.(GADDY, FRANKLIN) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ***Re-filed at #12 *** MOTION to Remand by CAROL JOHNSON filed by FRANKLIN GADDY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(GADDY, FRANKLIN) Modified on 11/3/2020 to add docket(vs). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #6 Answer to Complaint filed by H&CS SERVICES LLC ); Notice to Counsel - Brian K. Mathis - Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(vs) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by H&CS SERVICES LLC (WALLACE II, MAX) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by H&CS SERVICES LLC with Jury Demand.(WALLACE II, MAX)Attorney MAX MATTHEW WALLACE II added to party H&CS SERVICES LLC(pty:dft) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #3 Motion to Stay Discovery, including disclosures, as to Defendant Zoll until the Court rules on Defendant Zoll's Notion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/16/2020 (TES) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ZOLL MEDICAL CORPORATION ); Notice to Counsel - THOMAS J. MAZZIOTTI Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(vs) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ZOLL MEDICAL CORPORATION ); Notice to Counsel - KEVIN B. HICKS, SR. Your contact information in CM/ECF is not current. Please update your contact information via PACER.(vs) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #1 Notice of Removal, filed by ZOLL MEDICAL CORPORATION ); Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. NO NEED TO REFILE.(vs) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zoll Medical Corporation (NEELY, EDGAR) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Stay Discovery by Zoll Medical Corporation filed by EDGAR A NEELY, IV. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(NEELY, EDGAR) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Zoll Medical Corporation filed by EDGAR A NEELY, IV. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - PMA Approval Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - PMA Supplement Listing)(NEELY, EDGAR) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against All Parties Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3596333, $400 filed by Zoll Medical Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - State Court Filings, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Def ZOLL Mass Business Entity Summary, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - State Court Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet)(NEELY, EDGAR) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less