Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/26/2020 at 09:43:23 (UTC).

Johnson et al v. Western National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/27/2020 Johnson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Western National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04163

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Troy Johnson

Deborah Johnson

Defendants

Western National Insurance Company

Western National Mutual Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Shawn M. Nichols

Attorney at Cadwell Sanford Deibert & Garry, LLP

200 E 10Th Street, Suite 200

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Defendant Attorney

Derek A. Nelsen

Attorney at Fuller, Williamson, Nelsen & Preheim, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/23/20. (SLW) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Extend re #5 Amended Complaint by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek A. Nelsen on behalf of Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Deborah Johnson. (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#7

(#7) AMENDED Summons Issued as to Western National Mutual Insurance Company. 1 Summons delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SAC) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Deborah Johnson. (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Deborah Johnson. (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Western National Insurance Company. 1 Summons for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SAC) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Deborah Johnson, Troy Johnson. (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

2 #1

AO 85

#2

(#2) LETTER regarding Rule 73 to counsel. (Attachments: #1 AO 85) (SLW) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3418844, in shell case on 10/27/20 filed by Troy Johnson, Deborah Johnson. (SLW) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Extend. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 12/23/20. (SLW) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION to Extend re #5 Amended Complaint by Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek A. Nelsen on behalf of Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #4 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Deborah Johnson. (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED Summons Issued as to Western National Mutual Insurance Company. 1 Summons delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SAC) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS(ES) by Deborah Johnson. (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Deborah Johnson. (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Western National Insurance Company. 1 Summons for each party delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (SAC) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS(ES) by Deborah Johnson, Troy Johnson. (Nichols, Shawn) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER regarding Rule 73 to counsel. (Attachments: #1 AO 85) (SLW) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-3418844, in shell case on 10/27/20 filed by Troy Johnson, Deborah Johnson. (SLW) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WESTERN NATIONAL MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, BOND NO. 29297 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Derek A. Nelsen