This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2022 at 06:18:49 (UTC).

Johnson et al v. Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2022 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nancy J. Rosenstengel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-PQ-01660

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nancy J. Rosenstengel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Johnson

Kathy Johnson

Defendants

Syngenta Crop Protection LLC

Syngenta AG

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

Special Master

Randi Ellis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Khaldoun A. Baghdadi

Attorney at Walkup, Melodia, Kelly & Schoenberger

650 California Street, 26Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94108

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Meyers & Flowers, LLC

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 1515

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Shoemake Doles

Attorney at Carey Danis & Lowe - St. Louis

8235 Forsyth Boulevard, Suite 1100

St. Louis, MO 63105

Archie I. Grubb, II

Attorney at Beasley Allen Law Firm

218 Commerce St., P. O. Box 4160

Montgomery, AL 36103-4160

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley H. Weidenhammer

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Leslie M. Smith

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60654

Michael J. Nester

Attorney at Donovan Rose Nester, P.C.

15 North First Street, Suite A

Belleville, IL 62220

Ragan Naresh

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis - Washington DC

1301 Pennsylvania Ave. N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Rebecca C. Fitzpatrick

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP - Chicago

300 North Lasalle

Chicago, IL 60654

Jihan E. Walker

Attorney at Jones Day - Chicago

110 North Wacker Drive, Suite 4800

Chicago, IL 60606

Megan Ann Scheiderer

Attorney at Husch Blackwell LLP - Kansas City

4801 Main Street, Suite 1000

Kansas City, MO 64112

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Summons Submitted. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#4

(#4) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/14/2022. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Conditional Transfer ORDER 29 transferring case to the Southern District of Illinois. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/26/2022)

7 #7

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

7 #1

*Restricted*

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 3:22-cv-00076. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Conditional Transfer ORDER 29 transferring case to the Southern District of Illinois. (jrb) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 7/14/2022. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketFiling fee: $402, receipt number AUG030939 (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Submitted. (maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Chevron U.S.A., Inc., Syngenta AG, Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC, filed by Michael Johnson, Kathy Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(maa) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 7/26/2022.] (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Syngenta Crop Protection L L C is a litigant