This case was last updated from PACER on 02/27/2021 at 17:17:49 (UTC).

Johnson et al v. Ablest, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Ablest, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Martin Reidinger and W. Carleton Metcalf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00336

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Martin Reidinger

Referral Judge

W. Carleton Metcalf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rika O. Johnson

Defendants

ViacomCBS Inc.

Daniel International Corporation

Fluor Constructors International

Goulds Pumps, Incorporated

Covil Corporation

William Powell Company

Crane Co.

Great Barrier Insulation Co.

Ablest, Inc.

Westinghouse Electric Corporation

Toledo Engineering Co., Inc.

General Electric Company

Grinnell LLC doing business as Grinnell Corporation

Aurora Pump Company

Fluor Constructors International, Inc.

Fluor Enterprises, Inc.

Daniel Construction Company, Inc.

Fluor Daniel Services Corporation

J & L Insulation, Inc.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William M. Graham

Attorney at Wallace & Graham

525 North Main Street

Salisbury, NC 28144

Shawna Forbes-King

Attorney at Dean Omar Branham Shirley LLP

302 N. Market Street, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer M. Techman

Attorney at Evert Weathersby Houff

3455 Peachtree Road, Ne, Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30326

W. David Conner

Attorney at Haynsworth, Sinkler, Boyd P.A.

75 Beattie Place, 11Th Floor

Greenville, SC 29601

Scott E. Frick

Attorney at Haynsworth, Sinkler, Boyd P.A.

75 Beattie Place, 11Th Floor

Greenville, SC 29601

Christopher B. Major

Attorney at Haynsworth Sinkler Boyd, P.A.

P.O. Box 2048

Greenville, SC 29602-2408

William M. Starr

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough, LLP

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202-4000

Tracy Edward Tomlin

Attorney at Nelson, Mullins, Riley & Scarborough LLP

301 South College Street, 23Rd Floor

Charlotte, NC 28202

Curtis J. Shipley

Attorney at Ellis & Winters LLP

Post Office Box 2752

Greensboro, NC 27402

Ashley Kamphaus Brathwaite

Attorney at Ellis & Winters, LLP

Post Office Box 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636

Leslie C. Packer

Attorney at Ellis & Winters, LLP

P. O. Box 33550

Raleigh, NC 27636

David B Oakley

Attorney at Poole Brooke Plumlee PC

4705 Columbus Street, Suite 100

Virginia Beach, VA 23462

Carl E. Pierce, III

Attorney at Pierce Sloan Kennedy & Early

321 East Bay St

Charleston, SC 29401

Carter T. Lambeth

Attorney at CARTER T. LAMBETH ATTORNEY, P.C.

P.O. Box 660

Wilmington, NC 28402

Cheryl D. Shoun

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, LLC

Post Office Box 486

Charleston, SC 29402

Peter A. Santos

Attorney at Nexsen Pruet, PLLC

227 West Trade Street, Suite 1550

Charlotte, NC 28202

Kimberly Sullivan

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

301 S. College St., Suite 3500

Charlotte, NC 28202

Mary Elizabeth O'Neill

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

301 S. College Street, Ste,. 3500, 301 South College Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Other Attorneys

Joshua H. Bennett

Attorney at Bennett Guthrie Latham, PLLC

1560 Westbrook Plaza Drive

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

Jasmine M. Pitt

Attorney at Bennett Guthrie PLLC

1560 Westbrook Plaza Dr

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#61

(#61) Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & L Insulation, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#60

(#60) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by J & L Insulation, Inc..(Williamson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

#59

(#59) ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Alexandra H. Austin admitted to practice in this action and added to case docket for Ablest, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/12/2021. (Attorney Austin served with this Order via NEF at aaustin@nexsenpruet.com) (maf) Modified text to reflect proper judge on 1/13/2021. NEF Regenerated. (maf) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#58

(#58) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by William Powell Company.(Oakley, David) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#57

(#57) Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company (Oakley, David) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#56

(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by David B Oakley on behalf of William Powell Company (Oakley, David) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#55

(#55) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by J & L Insulation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williamson, Stephen). Modified referral on 1/11/2021 (thh). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

53 #1

Proposed Order

#53

(#59) ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Alexandra H. Austin admitted to practice in this action and added to case docket for Ablest, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/12/2021. (Attorney Austin served with this Order via NEF at aaustin@nexsenpruet.com) (maf) Modified text to reflect proper judge on 1/13/2021. NEF Regenerated. (maf) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shawna Forbes-King Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4804386. by Rika O. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Shawna Forbes-King) (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 12/14/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine M. Pitt on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Pitt, Jasmine) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC (Bennett, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Bennett, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Barrier Insulation Co. (Lambeth, Carter) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Great Barrier Insulation Co..(Lambeth, Carter) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carter T. Lambeth on behalf of Great Barrier Insulation Co. (Lambeth, Carter) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Ablest, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Covil Corporation, Crane Co., Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Great Barrier Insulation Co., Grinnell LLC, J & L Insulation, Inc., Rika O. Johnson, Toledo Engineering Co., Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, William Powell Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (maf) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

#1

(#55) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by J & L Insulation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williamson, Stephen). Modified referral on 1/11/2021 (thh). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Corporate Disclosure Statement by J & L Insulation, Inc. (Williamson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by J & L Insulation, Inc..(Williamson, Stephen) (Entered: 02/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNotice to Alexandra H. Austin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov by 1/20/2021. (Attorney Austin served with this Notice via NEF at aaustin@nexsenpruet.com) (maf) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ORDER granting #53 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Alexandra H. Austin admitted to practice in this action and added to case docket for Ablest, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/12/2021. (Attorney Austin served with this Order via NEF at aaustin@nexsenpruet.com) (maf) Modified text to reflect proper judge on 1/13/2021. NEF Regenerated. (maf) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by William Powell Company.(Oakley, David) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) Corporate Disclosure Statement by William Powell Company (Oakley, David) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) NOTICE of Appearance by David B Oakley on behalf of William Powell Company (Oakley, David) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #55 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. J & L Insulation, Inc. answer due 2/8/2021. Text of Order: The Defendant J&L Insulation, Inc.'s Motion is GRANTED, and this Defendant shall have an additional thirty (30) days, through and including February 8, 2021, within which to serve its Answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiffs Complaint. So Ordered. Entered by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/12/21. (LMR) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf no longer assigned to case. (thh) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by J & L Insulation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Williamson, Stephen). Modified referral on 1/11/2021 (thh). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shawna Forbes-King Filing fee $ 288, receipt number 0419-4804386. by Rika O. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Shawna Forbes-King) (Graham, William). Motions referred to W. Carleton Metcalf. (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jasmine M. Pitt on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Pitt, Jasmine) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps, LLC (Bennett, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Bennett, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great Barrier Insulation Co. (Lambeth, Carter) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Great Barrier Insulation Co..(Lambeth, Carter) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Carter T. Lambeth on behalf of Great Barrier Insulation Co. (Lambeth, Carter) (Entered: 12/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to Ablest, Inc., Aurora Pump Company, Covil Corporation, Crane Co., Daniel International Corporation, Fluor Constructors International, Fluor Constructors International, Inc., Fluor Daniel Services Corporation, Fluor Enterprises, Inc., General Electric Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Great Barrier Insulation Co., Grinnell LLC, J & L Insulation, Inc., Rika O. Johnson, Toledo Engineering Co., Inc., ViacomCBS Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, William Powell Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (maf) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Chief Judge Martin Reidinger and Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (maf) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT , with Jury Demand, filed by Jackie Lee Johnson against All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0419-4773525) (Graham, William) Modified docket text on 11/23/2020. (maf) Modified text on 12/1/2020 (rth). (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVIL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant