This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/11/2020 at 07:46:11 (UTC).

Johnson et al v. Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Johnson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dasmen Residential Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carl Barbier, Dana Douglas and Barry W Ashe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-14637

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Dana Douglas

Presiding Judges

Carl Barbier

Barry W Ashe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Penny Johnson

Porsha Brooks

Shirley Payton

Wenonah J Cutler

Rochelle Mitchell

Defendants

RH Eastlake, LLC

Eastlake Development, LLC

Dasmen Residential Management, LLC

Wilshire Insurance Company

Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.

KFK Group, Inc.

KFK Development, LLC

Lynd Property Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suzette Peychaud Bagneris

Attorney at Bagneris Firm, LLC

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

DeVonn Henry-Joseph Jarrett

Attorney at Jarrett Law Group

643 Magazine Street, Suite 301A

New Orleans, LA 70130

Emile Anthony Bagneris, III

Attorney at The Bagneris Firm

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Stephen Bergeron

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Emily E. Eagan

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Tucker Tyler Bohren

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Michael Edward Hill

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Cassie E. Preston

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jonathan M. Walsh

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Andrew J Brien

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

David F. Waguespack

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

David Scotton

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux,

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Victoria J. Cvitanovic

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice (1450 Poydras)

1450 Poydras Street, Suite 900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Mary Kerrigan Dennard

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dakota Kyle Chenevert

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Tabitha Robertson Durbin

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Jennifer E. Michel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Gustave A. Fritchie, III

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Troy Lashon Bell

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #1

Proposed Order Order

#15

#14

#13

#12

11 #1

Exhibit

#11

#10

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

#7

#5

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Counsel: ORDERED that within 14 days of the date of this order, counsel show cause, if any, why the matters listed on this Order should not be consolidated. Such submissions shall be made in writing and filed only in the record of the first case listed in the caption of the Order. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 02/6/2020.(ko) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Jonathan M. Walsh, Cassie E. Preston, Victoria J. Cvitanovic for Eastlake Development, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, KFK Group, Inc. Attorney David F. Waguespack; Andrew J Brien and David Scotton terminated. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/23/2020. (clw) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Eastlake Development, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, KFK Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party Eastlake Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party KFK Development, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Cassie E. Preston added to party KFK Group, Inc.(pty:dft).(Preston, Cassie) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc..Attorney Troy Lashon Bell added to party Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bell, Troy) Modified text on 1/15/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC.(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Wilshire Insurance Company.(Durbin, Tabitha) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Compliance by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC re #5 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #8 motion is GRANTED. Defendants, Dasmen Residential Mgmt., LLC and RH Eastlake, LLC, pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, granted an extension of time of twenty-one (21) days in which to file responsive pleadings to the Plaintiffs' Petition for Damages from the time otherwise due, up through and including January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/23/2019. (am) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #7 motion is GRANTED. Defendant Wilshire Insurance Company, pursuant to Local Rule 7.8, is granted an extension of time of twenty- one (21) days in which to file responsive pleadings to the Plaintiffs Petition for Damages from the time otherwise due, up through and including January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/23/2019. (am) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohren, Tucker) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Wilshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Wilshire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. The Court has been informed that the above-captioned case is related to Civil Action No. 19-13650, Akeem v. Dasmen Residential, LLC, previously allotted to Section "M"(3) of this Court. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned matter be TRANSFERRED to Section "M"(3) for further proceedings. Case transferred to Judge Barry W Ashe. Judge Carl Barbier no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/16/2019.(cg) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Directives pursuant to 28:1447(b) by Clerk(cg) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (ess) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Eastlake, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2019-12039 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8025113) filed by Dasmen Residential Management, LLC, Eastlake Development, LLC, Wilshire Insurance Company, Lynd Property Management, LLC, Latter & Blum Property Management, Inc., RH Eastlake, LLC, KFK Development, LLC, Porsha Brooks, KFK Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party Dasmen Residential Management, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party RH Eastlake, LLC(pty:dft).(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFK Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dasmen Residential LLC is a litigant