This case was last updated from PACER on 10/18/2020 at 09:16:23 (UTC).

Johns et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Johns filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard G. Andrews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01083

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Andrews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Johns

Margaret Johns

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Joseph Leoni

Attorney at Shelsby & Leoni

221 Main Street

Stanton, DE 19804

Christopher A. Gomez

Aaron L. Dunbar

Lee B. Balefsky

Defendant Attorneys

Colleen D. Shields

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

222 Delaware Avenue, 7Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Alexandra Rogin

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

222 Delaware Avenue, 7Th Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Michelle M. Tessier

Christine R. M. Kain

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Rogin, Alexandra) Modified on 10/2/2020 (nms). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#26

(#26) Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to James H. Keale and Michael A. Tanenbaum. (Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward) (mal) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#22

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

16 #81

Exhibit ECF 275 - Exh B

16 #63

Exhibit ECF 4959 - Pltf_s Response to BSC_s MTE Iakovlev

16 #53

Exhibit ECF 7057 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response Guelcher

16 #48

Exhibit ECF 4969 - BSC_s Response in Opp to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg

16 #47

Exhibit ECF 7088 - BSC_s Response in Opposition to Pltf_s MTE Spiegelberg

16 #44

Exhibit ECF 6047 - Memorandum Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion re Dr. P. Ros

16 #43

Exhibit ECF 5039 - Pltf_s Reply Brief in Support of MTE Rosenblatt

16 #41

Exhibit ECF 4978 - Exh A

16 #29

Exhibit ECF 4825 - Exh 3

16 #20

Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX E

16 #19

Exhibit ECF 1010 - EX D

16 #14

Exhibit ECF 6041 - Memo Opinion and Order re Daubert Motion Badylak

#11

No Description Available

2 #1

Exhibit A

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Order Setting Rule 16(b) Telephone Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/22/2020, at 9:00 AM before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/14/2020. (nms) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Joint Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Rogin, Alexandra) Modified on 10/2/2020 (nms). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • Docket(#27) ORAL ORDER: A joint statement pursuant to Local Rule 81.2 is due no later than three (3) days from the date of this Order. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/29/2020. (nms) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Return of Undeliverable Mail sent to James H. Keale and Michael A. Tanenbaum. (Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward) (mal) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Michelle M. Tessier for Boston Scientific Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Christine R. M. Kain for Boston Scientific Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christine R. M. Kain, filed by Boston Scientific Corporation, and #25 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle M. Tessier, filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/2/2020. (nms) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michelle M. Tessier - filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Shields, Colleen) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Christine R. M. Kain - filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Shields, Colleen) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Aaron L. Dunbar, Christopher A. Gomez, Lee B. Balefsky for Elizabeth Hutchinson, John F. Hutchinson, Jr, David Johns, Margaret Johns added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-01083-RGA, 1:20-cv-01084-RGA(kmd) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Johns, Margaret Johns for Rule 26 Expert Disclosures. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Thomas Edward Bosworth on behalf of Margaret Johns. (Bosworth, Thomas) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael A. Tanenbaum on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Tanenbaum, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 03/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by David Johns, Margaret Johns. (Jimenez, Priscilla) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman/Partner on 05/24/2013. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 5/7/2013, answer due 7/8/2013. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 06/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/23/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 44 (SHOW CAUSE ORDER REGARDING DISMISSAL OF COLOPLAST A/S, COLOPLAST MANUFACTURING US, LLC AND PORGES S.A.) entered on 04/19/2013 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (jap) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2386826. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jws) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 8/19/2020.] (Entered: 05/02/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less