This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 06:39:26 (UTC).

John v. HESS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 John filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HESS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilma A. Lewis and Emile A. Henderson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00028

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilma A. Lewis

Referral Judge

Emile A. Henderson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joan John

Defendants

HESS CORPORATION

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VA 00820

Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VA 00820

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur M. Murray

Attorney at MURRAY LAW FIRM

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70130

Harry Richard Yelton

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP

365 Canal St. Ste. 1170

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jacob Gower

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP

365 Canal Street,, Ste 1170

New Orleans, LA 70130

John-Russell Bart Pate

Attorney at The Pate Law Firm

P.O. Box 370

Christiansted, VA 00821

Korey A Nelson

Attorney at Burns and Charest LLP

365 Canal Street Ste. 1170 , La 70130

365 Canal Street Ste. 1170, LA 70130

Warren T Burns

Attorney at Burns Charest LLP

900 Jackson Street, Suite 500

Dallas, TX 75202

Defendant Attorney

Michael A Rogers

Attorney at Beckstedt & Kuczynski LLP

2162 Church St

Christiansted, VA 00820

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Rogers on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by HESS CORPORATION. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HESS CORPORATION. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. identifying Corporate Parent HESS CORPORATION for Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp... (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#14

(#8) ORDER (RAM) REASSIGNING CASE dated 5/2/2022. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (EMK) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to HONX, INC. by HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 05/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER (RAM) REASSIGNING CASE dated 5/2/2022. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Emile A. Henderson III for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge George W. Cannon, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (EMK) (Entered: 05/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. identifying Corporate Parent HESS CORPORATION for Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp... (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HESS CORPORATION. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by HESS CORPORATION. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A Rogers on behalf of Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendants HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp. from Superior Court, Division of St. Croix, case number SX-2022-CV-00055. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-996552)filed by HESS CORPORATION, Hess Oil New York Corp, as successor by merger of Hess Oil Virgin Islands Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Rogers, Michael) (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hess Oil New York Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS is a litigant